BROCK et al v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: WILLIAM L. BROCK and JANE Y. BROCK
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED, COVIL CORPORATION, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP., OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, CRANE CO., VELAN VALVE CORP., DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, Maxcess Americas, Inc., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, R.P. Andrews Paper Company, Inc., ERICSSON INC., THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, ASTENJOHNSON, INC., CBS Corporation (a Delaware Corporation), ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, GRINNELL, LLC, ITT CORPORATION, UNIROYAL HOLDING INC., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC., Scapa Waycross, Inc., WARREN PUMPS, LLC, THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. and CBS CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00314
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
2 Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 107 RESPONSE re #106 Failure to Make Service Letter filed by JANE Y. BROCK, WILLIAM L. BROCK. Replies due by 7/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(PAUL, KEVIN)
June 21, 2019 Filing 106 Notice to Plaintiff for Failure to Make Service Within 90 Days as to Defendants R.P. Andrews Paper Company, Inc. and Uniroyal Holding Inc. (Blay, Debbie)
June 14, 2019 Motion Submitted: #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
June 14, 2019 Filing 105 REPLY, filed by Defendant ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP., to Response to #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Shofner Declaration and Email, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration)(RUBEL, DOUGLAS)
June 6, 2019 Set Reply deadline re: #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Replies due by 6/14/2019. (Daniel, J)
June 6, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #104 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. For good cause shown, Defendant Albany International Corporation shall have up to and including June 14, 2019 to file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/6/2019.(Lee, Pedra)
June 6, 2019 Motion Referred: RE: #104 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #97 Response in Opposition to Motion, #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Blay, Debbie)
June 6, 2019 Filing 104 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #97 Response in Opposition to Motion, #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RUBEL, DOUGLAS)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 5/30/2019. All claims brought against Defendant Maxcess Americas, Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Each party will bear its own costs. (Daniel, J)
May 30, 2019 Filing 102 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
May 29, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ERIN ELAINE SHOFNER on behalf of Defendant ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP. (SHOFNER, ERIN)
May 29, 2019 Motion Submitted: #100 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Maxcess Americas, Inc. (Without Prejudice) to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
May 29, 2019 Filing 100 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Maxcess Americas, Inc. (Without Prejudice) by MAXCESS AMERICAS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 6/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(PECK, TIMOTHY)
May 24, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EMILY K. MATHER on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (MATHER, EMILY)
May 24, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EMILY K. MATHER on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (MATHER, EMILY)
May 23, 2019 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP. filed by JANE Y. BROCK, WILLIAM L. BROCK. Replies due by 6/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(PAUL, KEVIN)
May 13, 2019 Filing 96 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant MAXCESS AMERICAS, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
May 13, 2019 Filing 95 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by MAXCESS AMERICAS, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
May 13, 2019 Filing 94 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ASTENJOHNSON, INC.. (HOLDEN, JOHN)
May 13, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEPHANIE G. FLYNN on behalf of Defendants ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC., VELAN VALVE CORP. (FLYNN, STEPHANIE)
May 6, 2019 Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
May 3, 2019 Filing 92 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP.. (RUBEL, DOUGLAS)
May 3, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DOUGLAS A. RUBEL on behalf of Defendant ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP. (RUBEL, DOUGLAS)
May 3, 2019 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT OF WILLIAM LUCIANO filed by ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP. in Support re: #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (RUBEL, DOUGLAS)
May 3, 2019 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP. re #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP.. (RUBEL, DOUGLAS)
May 3, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP.. Response to Motion due by 5/24/2019 (RUBEL, DOUGLAS)
April 26, 2019 Filing 87 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (JONES, KELLY)
April 26, 2019 Filing 86 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (JONES, KELLY)
April 25, 2019 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCAPA WAYCROSS, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
April 25, 2019 Filing 84 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC..(HOLMES, JANICE)
April 25, 2019 Filing 83 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. (HOLMES, JANICE)
April 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
April 24, 2019 Filing 82 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
April 24, 2019 Filing 81 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
April 24, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSEPH D. HAMMOND on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (HAMMOND, JOSEPH)
April 24, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CURTIS J. SHIPLEY on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (SHIPLEY, CURTIS)
April 24, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LESLIE C. PACKER on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (PACKER, LESLIE)
April 24, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
April 24, 2019 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
April 24, 2019 Filing 75 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
April 24, 2019 Filing 74 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by SCAPA WAYCROSS, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
April 23, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TIMOTHY PECK on behalf of Defendant MAXCESS AMERICAS, INC. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 18, 2019 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
April 18, 2019 Filing 71 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
April 18, 2019 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 18, 2019 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 18, 2019 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 18, 2019 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 18, 2019 Filing 66 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 18, 2019 Filing 65 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 18, 2019 Filing 64 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 18, 2019 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 18, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SCOTT E. FRICK on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. (FRICK, SCOTT)
April 18, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney W. DAVID CONNER on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. (CONNER, W.)
April 18, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MOFFATT G. MCDONALD on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. (MCDONALD, MOFFATT)
April 17, 2019 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VELAN VALVE CORP.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 17, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by VELAN VALVE CORP.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 17, 2019 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 17, 2019 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 17, 2019 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 17, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 17, 2019 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ERICSSON INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 52 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ERICSSON INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (OAKLEY, DAVID)
April 17, 2019 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY (OAKLEY, DAVID)
April 17, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID B. OAKLEY on behalf of Defendant THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY (OAKLEY, DAVID)
April 16, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant GRINNELL, LLC (STARR, WILLIAM)
April 16, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant ITT CORPORATION (STARR, WILLIAM)
April 16, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED (STARR, WILLIAM)
April 16, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (STARR, WILLIAM)
April 16, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (STARR, WILLIAM)
April 16, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant ITT CORPORATION by ITT CORPORATION.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ITT CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant ITT CORPORATION (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GRINNELL, LLC by GRINNELL, LLC.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GRINNELL, LLC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant GRINNELL, LLC (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED by GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 16, 2019 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION.(SLOSSON, JOHN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (SLOSSON, JOHN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN S. SLOSSON on behalf of Defendant OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (SLOSSON, JOHN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by CRANE CO.. (MATHER, EMILY)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. Answer due by 5/17/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 4/12/19. (Brubaker, John)
April 12, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HOLMES, JANICE)
April 12, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
April 12, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
April 12, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
April 12, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CBS CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.. (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
April 11, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.. (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant WARREN PUMPS, LLC by WARREN PUMPS, LLC.(BENNETT, JOSHUA)
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and to Cross-Claims of any and all other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KELLY BROOKS JONES on behalf of Defendant THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (JONES, KELLY)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEVIN W. PAUL on behalf of Plaintiffs JANE Y. BROCK, WILLIAM L. BROCK (PAUL, KEVIN)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC..(HOLMES, JANICE)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JANICE HOLMES on behalf of Defendant SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. (HOLMES, JANICE)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by ASTENJOHNSON, INC. Answer due by 5/17/2019. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 4/5/2019 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court.(Powell, Gloria)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTENJOHNSON, INC.. (HOLDEN, JOHN)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ASTENJOHNSON, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for MEOT to Answer)(HOLDEN, JOHN)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN T. HOLDEN on behalf of Defendant ASTENJOHNSON, INC. (HOLDEN, JOHN)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN T. HOLDEN on behalf of Defendant ASTENJOHNSON, INC. (HOLDEN, JOHN)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARLA T. RESCHLY on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (RESCHLY, MARLA)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CRANE CO. (MATHER, EMILY)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EMILY K. MATHER on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (MATHER, EMILY)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Fluor Constructors Intl., #2 Summons issued to Fluor Enterprises Inc.) (Garland, Leah)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP., ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., ASTENJOHNSON, INC., CBS CORPORATION, CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., COVIL CORPORATION, CRANE CO., DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, ERICSSON INC., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED, GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC., GRINNELL, LLC, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., ITT CORPORATION, MAXCESS AMERICAS, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, R.P. ANDREWS PAPER COMPANY, INC.. ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC., SCAPA WAYCROSS, INC., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., UNIROYAL HOLDING INC., VELAN VALVE CORP., WARREN PUMPS, LLC, THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Coyne, Michelle) Modified on 3/21/2019 to list only defendants for which summons were issued. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah)
March 20, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garland, Leah)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2534431.), filed by William L. Brock, Jane Y. Brock.(GRAHAM, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROCK et al v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COVIL CORPORATION
Represented By: LESLIE C. PACKER
Represented By: ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE
Represented By: CURTIS J. SHIPLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH D. HAMMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Represented By: DOUGLAS A. RUBEL
Represented By: ERIN ELAINE SHOFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN S. SLOSSON
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: MARLA T. RESCHLY
Represented By: EMILY K. MATHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE CORP.
Represented By: STEPHANIE G. FLYNN
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxcess Americas, Inc.
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.P. Andrews Paper Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERICSSON INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN B. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: KELLY BROOKS JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTENJOHNSON, INC.
Represented By: JOHN T. HOLDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation (a Delaware Corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC.
Represented By: STEPHANIE G. FLYNN
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.
Represented By: JANICE HOLMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN B. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: STEPHANIE G. FLYNN
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL, LLC
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT CORPORATION
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL HOLDING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KEITH E. COLTRAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN B. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scapa Waycross, Inc.
Represented By: STEPHEN B. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID B. OAKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM L. BROCK
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Represented By: KEVIN W. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE Y. BROCK
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Represented By: KEVIN W. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?