MARKET AMERICA, INC. et al v. ZOU et al

Petitioner: STEVE ASHLEY, PATRICK HSIEH, ALICE HSIEH, MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE, INC., EUGENE WALLACE, ROGER WU, ALICE CHIOU, ANTHONY AKERS, SAM RITCHIE, MICHAEL BRADY, MARKET AMERICA, INC., LOREN RIDINGER, PETER GOLD, KEVIN BUCKMAN, DENNIS FRANKS, MIN LIU, MING-CHU KUO, EDDY ALBERTY, VICTOR J. CHIOU, MARTY WEISSMAN, BRANDI QUINN, VINCE HUNT, MARC ASHLEY, JIM WINKLER, CHRIS PEDDYCORD, SHOP MA, INC., JAMES HOWARD RIDINGER and JOE BOLYARD
Respondent: JINHUA ZOU, YU XIA LU, OLLIE LAN, CHUANJIE YANG and LIU LIU
Case Number: 1:2019cv00315
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Based on First to File Rule, Or In The Alternative Motion To Stay, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Blake J. Lindemann filed by Respondent JINHUA ZOU re #15 Reply to Response to Motion filed by JINHUA ZOU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(LINDEMANN, BLAKE)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY, filed by Respondent JINHUA ZOU, to Response to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Based on First to File Rule, Or In The Alternative Motion To Stay filed by JINHUA ZOU. (LINDEMANN, BLAKE)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION filed by Petitioners ANTHONY AKERS, EDDY ALBERTY, MARC ASHLEY, STEVE ASHLEY, JOE BOLYARD, MICHAEL BRADY, KEVIN BUCKMAN, ALICE CHIOU, VICTOR J. CHIOU, DENNIS FRANKS, PETER GOLD, ALICE HSIEH, PATRICK HSIEH, VINCE HUNT, MING-CHU KUO, MIN LIU, MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE, INC., MARKET AMERICA, INC., CHRIS PEDDYCORD, BRANDI QUINN, JAMES HOWARD RIDINGER, LOREN RIDINGER, SAM RITCHIE, SHOP MA, INC., EUGENE WALLACE, MARTY WEISSMAN, JIM WINKLER, ROGER WU re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Based on First to File Rule, Or In The Alternative Motion To Stay, #13 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by ANTHONY AKERS, EDDY ALBERTY, MARC ASHLEY, STEVE ASHLEY, JOE BOLYARD, MICHAEL BRADY, KEVIN BUCKMAN, ALICE CHIOU, VICTOR J. CHIOU, DENNIS FRANKS, PETER GOLD, ALICE HSIEH, PATRICK HSIEH, VINCE HUNT, MING-CHU KUO, MIN LIU, MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE, INC., MARKET AMERICA, INC., CHRIS PEDDYCORD, BRANDI QUINN, JAMES HOWARD RIDINGER, LOREN RIDINGER, SAM RITCHIE, SHOP MA, INC., EUGENE WALLACE, MARTY WEISSMAN, JIM WINKLER, ROGER WU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-CD Cal 1st Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-CD Cal Motion to Transfer, #3 Exhibit C-CD Cal Civil Minutes on Motion to Transfer, #4 Exhibit D-ND Cal Action Complaint, #5 Exhibit E-CD Cal Order Transferring Action)(MILLEN, PRESSLY)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Based on First to File Rule, Or In The Alternative Motion To Stay filed by JINHUA ZOU filed by ANTHONY AKERS, EDDY ALBERTY, MARC ASHLEY, STEVE ASHLEY, JOE BOLYARD, MICHAEL BRADY, KEVIN BUCKMAN, ALICE CHIOU, VICTOR J. CHIOU, DENNIS FRANKS, PETER GOLD, ALICE HSIEH, PATRICK HSIEH, VINCE HUNT, MING-CHU KUO, MIN LIU, MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE, INC., MARKET AMERICA, INC., CHRIS PEDDYCORD, BRANDI QUINN, JAMES HOWARD RIDINGER, LOREN RIDINGER, SAM RITCHIE, SHOP MA, INC., EUGENE WALLACE, MARTY WEISSMAN, JIM WINKLER, ROGER WU. Replies due by 7/3/2019 (MILLEN, PRESSLY)
May 30, 2019 TEXT ORDER by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 5/30/19 granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Based on First to File Rule, Or In The Alternative Motion To Stay, briefing dates are extended on Respondents' Motion to Dismiss to 6/19/2019, and Respondents' Reply is due by 7/5/2019. (Garrett, Kim)
May 30, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Based on First to File Rule, Or In The Alternative Motion To Stay , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Based on First to File Rule, Or In The Alternative Motion To Stay by ANTHONY AKERS, EDDY ALBERTY, MARC ASHLEY, STEVE ASHLEY, JOE BOLYARD, MICHAEL BRADY, KEVIN BUCKMAN, ALICE CHIOU, VICTOR J. CHIOU, DENNIS FRANKS, PETER GOLD, ALICE HSIEH, PATRICK HSIEH, VINCE HUNT, MING-CHU KUO, MIN LIU, MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE, INC., MARKET AMERICA, INC., CHRIS PEDDYCORD, BRANDI QUINN, JAMES HOWARD RIDINGER, LOREN RIDINGER, SAM RITCHIE, SHOP MA, INC., EUGENE WALLACE, MARTY WEISSMAN, JIM WINKLER, ROGER WU. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLEN, PRESSLY)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by JINHUA ZOU re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Based on First to File Rule, Or In The Alternative Motion To Stay, #10 Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(LINDEMANN, BLAKE)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Based on First to File Rule, Or In The Alternative Motion To Stay by Respondent JINHUA ZOU filed by JINHUA ZOU. (LINDEMANN, BLAKE)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Based on First to File Rule, Or In The Alternative Motion To Stay by JINHUA ZOU. Response to Motion due by 6/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LINDEMANN, BLAKE)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance (LINDEMANN, BLAKE)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by FedEx Signature as to OLLIE LAN served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; LIU LIU served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; CHUANJIE YANG served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery (O. Lan), #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Delivery (C. Yang), #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Deliver (L. Lui))(MILLEN, PRESSLY)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to OLLIE LAN, LIU LIU, CHUANJIE YANG, JINHUA ZOU. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Chuan Jie Yang, #2 Summons issued to Ollie Lan, #3 Summons issued to Liu Liu) (Garland, Leah)
March 21, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Garland, Leah)
March 21, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garland, Leah)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHOP MA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE, INC. for SHOP MA, INC... (MILLEN, PRESSLY)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE, INC.. (MILLEN, PRESSLY)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARKET AMERICA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE, INC. for MARKET AMERICA, INC... (MILLEN, PRESSLY)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration) against OLLIE LAN, LIU LIU, YU XIA LU, CHUANJIE YANG, JINHUA ZOU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2534686.)(Related Case # 1:17-cv-897), filed by EDDY ALBERTY, JIM WINKLER, MARTY WEISSMAN, VICTOR J. CHIOU, CHRIS PEDDYCORD, MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE, INC., MING-CHU KUO, MARKET AMERICA, INC., BRANDI QUINN, MIN LIU, VINCE HUNT, MICHAEL BRADY, MARC ASHLEY, ALICE CHIOU, ALICE HSIEH, ROGER WU, SHOP MA, INC., JOE BOLYARD, STEVE ASHLEY, EUGENE WALLACE, KEVIN BUCKMAN, PETER GOLD, DENNIS FRANKS, JAMES HOWARD RIDINGER, PATRICK HSIEH, SAM RITCHIE, ANTHONY AKERS, LOREN RIDINGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Zou v. MA Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2-Agreement)(MILLEN, PRESSLY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARKET AMERICA, INC. et al v. ZOU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STEVE ASHLEY
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PATRICK HSIEH
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALICE HSIEH
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EUGENE WALLACE
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROGER WU
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALICE CHIOU
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTHONY AKERS
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SAM RITCHIE
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL BRADY
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARKET AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LOREN RIDINGER
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PETER GOLD
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KEVIN BUCKMAN
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DENNIS FRANKS
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MIN LIU
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MING-CHU KUO
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EDDY ALBERTY
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VICTOR J. CHIOU
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARTY WEISSMAN
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRANDI QUINN
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VINCE HUNT
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARC ASHLEY
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JIM WINKLER
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHRIS PEDDYCORD
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHOP MA, INC.
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMES HOWARD RIDINGER
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOE BOLYARD
Represented By: PRESSLY MCAULEY MILLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JINHUA ZOU
Represented By: BLAKE J. LINDEMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: YU XIA LU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: OLLIE LAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHUANJIE YANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LIU LIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?