MCDANIEL, et al v. JOHN CRANE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL and KENNETH R. MCDANIEL
Defendant: VIKING PUMP, INC., COVIL CORPORATION, GRINNELL LLC, GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED, BW/IP, INC., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, CRANE CO., THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY, HILLS-MCCANNA, LLC, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, JOHN CRANE, INC., ITT CORPORATION, ANDRONACO, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY and CBS CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00359
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 167 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Defendant CBS CORPORATION re #153 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions filed by CBS CORPORATION, #123 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS CORPORATION (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
July 23, 2020 Filing 166 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Defendant ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 7/8/2020; that the parties' Joint Motion for Dismissal, (Doc. #142 ), is GRANTED and that all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Viking Pump, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Except as otherwise agreed, the respective parties shall bear their own costs in this action. (Hicks, Samantha)
July 7, 2020 Motions Submitted re: #103 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #110 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #119 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #123 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #129 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Charles Ay, #131 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Arnold Brody and Every Exposure, #133 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Steven Haber, #135 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Charles Ay, #137 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Arnold R. Brody, Ph.D., #139 NOTICE of Joinder, #142 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Viking Pump, Inc., #153 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions, to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. (Welch, Kelly)
July 6, 2020 Filing 164 REPLY, filed by Defendant CBS CORPORATION, to Response to #153 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions filed by CBS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Discovery Request to Plaintiff)(TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 6/29/2020; that Plaintiffs' motion to exceed the word count, (Doc. #149 ), is GRANTED and that Plaintiffs' response, (Doc. #148 ), is deemed filed in excess of 6,250 words, but not more than 6,745 words in length. (Hicks, Samantha)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 6/29/2020; that Plaintiffs' motion to exceed the word count, (Doc. #147 ), is GRANTED and that Plaintiffs' response, (Doc. #146 ), is deemed filed in excess of 6,250 words, but not more than 7,510 words in length. (Hicks, Samantha)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 6/29/2020; that Plaintiffs' motion to exceed the word count, (Doc. #145 ), is GRANTED and that Plaintiffs' response, (Doc. #144 ), is deemed filed in excess of 6,250 words, but not more than 7,849 words in length. (Hicks, Samantha)
June 29, 2020 Filing 160 RESPONSE in Opposition re #154 Brief, #153 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions filed by CBS CORPORATION filed by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. Replies due by 7/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2019-07-22- McDaniel - WH rpd, #2 Exhibit 2 - Responses to CBS RFPs, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email to Techman)(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
June 26, 2020 Filing 159 REPLY, filed by Defendant COVIL CORPORATION, to Response to #137 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Arnold R. Brody, Ph.D. filed by COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
June 26, 2020 Filing 158 REPLY, filed by Defendant COVIL CORPORATION, to Response to #135 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Charles Ay filed by COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
June 22, 2020 Filing 157 REPLY, filed by Defendant COVIL CORPORATION, to Response to #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by COVIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Excerpts from Kenneth McDaniel Deposition, #2 Exhibit B. Excerpts from Terry Tilley Deposition, #3 Exhibit C. Porter-Hayden Company Quotation, #4 Exhibit D. Excerpts from Douglas Ware Deposition)(BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
June 22, 2020 Filing 156 REPLY, filed by Defendant CBS CORPORATION, to Response to #123 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Depo Excerpts, #2 Exhibit Ex B General Conditions of Contract)(TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
June 22, 2020 Filing 155 REPLY, filed by Defendant DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, to Response to #103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (CONNER, W.)
June 15, 2020 Filing 154 BRIEF re #153 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit Excerpts from July 24, 2019 Deposition of Deborah McDaniel, #4 Exhibit Correspondence dated March 6, 2020, #5 Exhibit Correspondence dated May 6, 2020, #6 Exhibit Correspondence dated May 12, 2020, #7 Exhibit Correspondence dated May 13, 2020)(TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
June 15, 2020 Filing 153 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions by CBS CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 6/29/2020 (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
June 12, 2020 Filing 152 RESPONSE in Opposition re #138 Brief, filed by COVIL CORPORATION, #132 Brief filed by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. Replies due by 6/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
June 12, 2020 Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition re #139 Notice of Joinder filed by COVIL CORPORATION, #134 Brief, #133 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Steven Haber filed by CBS CORPORATION filed by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. Replies due by 6/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
June 12, 2020 Filing 150 RESPONSE in Opposition re #135 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Charles Ay filed by COVIL CORPORATION, #129 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Charles Ay filed by CBS CORPORATION filed by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. Replies due by 6/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
June 8, 2020 Filing 149 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit to Plaintiffs Response to Daniel International MSJ by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. Responses due by 6/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
June 8, 2020 Filing 148 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION filed by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. Replies due by 6/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
June 8, 2020 Filing 147 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Plaintiffs Response to Covil MSJ by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. Responses due by 6/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
June 8, 2020 Filing 146 RESPONSE in Opposition re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by COVIL CORPORATION filed by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. Replies due by 6/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
June 8, 2020 Filing 145 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit to Plaintiffs Response to CBS MSJ by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. Responses due by 6/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
June 8, 2020 Filing 144 RESPONSE in Opposition re #123 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS CORPORATION filed by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. Replies due by 6/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 6/1/2020; that the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. #140 ), is GRANTED and that all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant BW/IP, Inc., and its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Except as otherwise agreed, the respective parties shall bear their own costs in this action. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment, (Doc. #117 ), filed by Defendant BW/IP, Inc., and its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries, is DENIED AS MOOT. (Hicks, Samantha)
June 1, 2020 Filing 142 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Viking Pump, Inc. by VIKING PUMP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 6/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DRAYTON, AMY)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 5/28/2020; that the Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #128 ] is GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall have until June 8, 2020, to respond to the summary judgment motions filed by Defendant Daniel International Corporation [Doc. #103 ] and Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, and Fluor Enterprises, Inc. [Doc. #105 ]. All other deadlines to remain in place as previously ordered. (Hicks, Samantha)
May 28, 2020 Filing 140 Joint MOTION to Dismiss BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries Only by BW/IP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 6/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'NEILL, M.)
May 26, 2020 Motion Referred re: #128 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #74 Rule 26f (Joint), #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #103 MOTION for Summary Judgment, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Welch, Kelly)
May 22, 2020 Filing 139 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Defendant COVIL CORPORATION JOINING #133 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Steven Haber (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
May 22, 2020 Filing 138 BRIEF re #137 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Arnold R. Brody, Ph.D. by Defendant COVIL CORPORATION filed by COVIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 01-Arnold Brody Report, #3 Exhibit 02-Michael Warhol Report)(BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
May 22, 2020 Filing 137 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Arnold R. Brody, Ph.D. by COVIL CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 6/12/2020 (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
May 22, 2020 Filing 136 BRIEF re #135 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Charles Ay by Defendant COVIL CORPORATION filed by COVIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 01-Exhibit 1 to Charles Ay Report, #3 Exhibit 02-Charles Ay Depo Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 03-Charles Ay Report)(BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
May 22, 2020 Filing 135 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Charles Ay by COVIL CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 6/12/2020 (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
May 22, 2020 Filing 134 BRIEF re #133 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Steven Haber . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Depo Excerpts, #2 Errata Ex B Haber Report)(TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
May 22, 2020 Filing 133 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Steven Haber by CBS CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 6/12/2020 (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
May 22, 2020 Filing 132 BRIEF re #131 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Arnold Brody and Every Exposure . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report)(TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
May 22, 2020 Filing 131 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Arnold Brody and Every Exposure by CBS CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 6/12/2020 (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
May 22, 2020 Filing 130 BRIEF re #129 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Charles Ay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex B Depo Excerpts, #3 Exhibit Ex C Affidavit)(TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
May 22, 2020 Filing 129 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Charles Ay by CBS CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 6/12/2020 (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
May 15, 2020 Filing 128 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #74 Rule 26f (Joint), #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #103 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
May 11, 2020 Filing 127 Corrected document re #126 BRIEF . (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 01, #3 Exhibit 02, #4 Exhibit 03, #5 Exhibit 04, #6 Exhibit 05, #7 Exhibit 06, #8 Exhibit 07, #9 Exhibit 08, #10 Exhibit 09, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY) Modified on 5/11/2020 to link to correct document. (Hicks, Samantha)
May 8, 2020 Filing 126 BRIEF re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant COVIL CORPORATION filed by COVIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 01, #3 Exhibit 02, #4 Exhibit 03, #5 Exhibit 04, #6 Exhibit 05, #7 Exhibit 06, #8 Exhibit 07, #9 Exhibit 08, #10 Exhibit 09, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
May 8, 2020 Filing 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment by COVIL CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 6/8/2020 (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
May 8, 2020 Filing 124 BRIEF re #123 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Doug Ware, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Deborah McDaniel Dep, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from Kenneth McDaniel Dep, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpts from Terry Tilly Dep, #5 Exhibit E - Correspondence, #6 Exhibit F - Correspondence, #7 Exhibit G - Letter & Addendum, #8 Exhibit H - Photos)(TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
May 8, 2020 Filing 123 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CBS CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 6/8/2020 (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
May 8, 2020 Filing 122 BRIEF re #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY filed by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (OAKLEY, DAVID)
May 8, 2020 Filing 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. Response to Motion due by 6/8/2020 (OAKLEY, DAVID)
May 8, 2020 Filing 120 BRIEF re #119 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. filed by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(PECK, TIMOTHY)
May 8, 2020 Filing 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Response to Motion due by 6/8/2020 (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 28, 2020 Filing 118 BRIEF of BW/IP, Inc. And Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment. (O'NEILL, M.)
April 28, 2020 Filing 117 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BW/IP, INC.. Response to Motion due by 5/28/2020 (O'NEILL, M.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 116 NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Defendant THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY (OAKLEY, DAVID)
April 27, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Defendant CBS CORPORATION (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
April 24, 2020 Filing 114 NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Defendant ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 24, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
April 24, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Defendant BW/IP, INC. (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
April 24, 2020 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY re #110 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY. (CONNER, W.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment by THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY. Response to Motion due by 5/26/2020 (CONNER, W.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Defendant ITT CORPORATION (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 24, 2020 Filing 108 NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Defendant GRINNELL LLC (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 24, 2020 Filing 107 NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 23, 2020 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. re #105 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deborah McDaniel Videotaped Depo, #2 Exhibit B - Kenneth McDaniel Videotaped Depo, #3 Exhibit C - Terry Russell Tilley Videotaped Depo)(CONNER, W.) (Main Document 106 replaced with corrected memorandum on 4/24/2020) (Hicks, Samantha)
April 23, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. Response to Motion due by 5/26/2020 (CONNER, W.) (Main Document 105 replaced with corrected motion on 4/24/2020) (Hicks, Samantha)
April 23, 2020 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION re #103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deborah McDaniel Videotaped Depo, #2 Exhibit B - Kenneth McDaniel Videotaped Depo, #3 Exhibit C - Terry Russell Tilley Videotaped Depo)(CONNER, W.) (Main Document 104 replaced with corrected memorandum on 4/24/2020) (Hicks, Samantha)
April 23, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 5/26/2020 (CONNER, W.) (Main Document 103 replaced with corrected motion on 4/24/2020) (Hicks, Samantha)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 04/15/2020; that the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. #101 ), is GRANTED and that all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Crane Co. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Except as otherwise agreed, the respective parties shall bear their own costs in this action. (Hicks, Samantha)
April 14, 2020 Motion Submitted re: #101 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Crane Co. Only, to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. (Welch, Kelly)
April 13, 2020 Filing 101 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Crane Co. Only by CRANE CO.. Response to Motion due by 5/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MATHER, EMILY)
March 16, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. OF SERVICE OF RULE 26 EXPERT DESIGNATIONS AND REPORTS (PECK, TIMOTHY)
March 16, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE by BW/IP, INC. of Service of Defendant BW/IP, Inc.'s Disclosure of Expert Witnesses (O'NEILL, M.)
March 16, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KIMBERLY SULLIVAN on behalf of Defendant BW/IP, INC. (SULLIVAN, KIMBERLY)
March 16, 2020 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE on behalf of COVIL CORPORATION (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
March 16, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE by CBS CORPORATION of Service of Expert Reports (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
February 26, 2020 Filing 95 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company Without Prejudice by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. (BRALY, BENJAMIN)
February 20, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant BW/IP, INC.. M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL is substituted as counsel for Defendant. Attorney TERRY M. BROWN, JR terminated. (O'NEILL, M.)
February 20, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL on behalf of Defendant BW/IP, INC. (O'NEILL, M.)
February 14, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL of Service of Plaintiffs' Expert Reports (BRALY, BENJAMIN)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 01/31/2020; that the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. #89 ), is GRANTED and that all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant John Crane, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Except as otherwise agreed, the respective parties shall bear their own costs in this action. (Hicks, Samantha)
January 28, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. ALEXANDER J. BUCKLEY is substituted as counsel for Defendant. (BUCKLEY, ALEXANDER)
January 24, 2020 Filing 89 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
January 24, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MASON E. FREEMAN on behalf of Defendant THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (FREEMAN, MASON)
January 7, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. ALEXANDER J. BUCKLEY is substituted as counsel for Defendant. Attorney KELLY BROOKS JONES terminated. (BUCKLEY, ALEXANDER)
January 7, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ALEXANDER J. BUCKLEY on behalf of Defendant THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (BUCKLEY, ALEXANDER)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/29/2019. Covil's Motion for an Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests (Doc. #83 ) is GRANTED, and Covil may serve its responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Propounded to Defendant Covil Corporation and Plaintiffs' Interrogatories Propounded to Defendant Covil Corporation on or before November 8, 2019. (Daniel, J)
October 29, 2019 Filing 84 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. (BRALY, BENJAMIN)
October 25, 2019 Motion Referred re: #83 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Welch, Kelly)
October 24, 2019 Filing 83 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests by COVIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCOGGAN, STEVEN)
October 16, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION. STEVEN A. SCOGGAN is substituted as counsel for Defendant. Attorney JOSEPH D. HAMMOND terminated. (SCOGGAN, STEVEN)
September 26, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Hearing: Master Trial Calendar: OCTOBER 5, 2020. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 09:30 AM in Unassigned Courtroom before UNASSIGNED. Unless the court orders otherwise, pretrial disclosures must be made no later than September 4, 2020. Motions in limine must be filed no later than September 11, 2020. Any objections to pretrial disclosures and responses to motions in limine must be served and promptly filed no later than September 18, 2020. Each party shall file a trial brief, along with proposed instructions on the issues no later than September 14, 2020.(Winchester, Robin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN H. DUNLAP on behalf of Defendant JOHN CRANE, INC. (DUNLAP, JONATHAN)
September 20, 2019 Filing 79 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL.(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
September 19, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TERRY M. BROWN, JR on behalf of Defendant BW/IP, INC. (BROWN, TERRY)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Appointing LYNN G. GULLICK as the mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL Designation of Mediator (BRALY, BENJAMIN)
July 25, 2019 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Selection of Mediator due by 8/14/2019. Mediation due by 4/30/2020.(Kemp, Donita)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #70 RULE 26F (JOINT) that the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report [Doc. #70 ] is approved as submitted and as modified herein. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2019. Defendant's Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 9/27/2019. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/24/2019.(Butler, Carol)
July 22, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRADLEY A. HAYS on behalf of Defendant JOHN CRANE, INC. (HAYS, BRADLEY)
July 10, 2019 Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (JONES, KELLY)
July 10, 2019 Filing 71 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (JONES, KELLY)
June 27, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #70 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
June 26, 2019 Filing 70 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BRALY, BENJAMIN)
June 21, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KELLY BROOKS JONES on behalf of Defendant THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (JONES, KELLY)
June 17, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SCOTT E. FRICK on behalf of Defendant DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (FRICK, SCOTT)
June 17, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney W. DAVID CONNER on behalf of Defendant DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (CONNER, W.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MOFFATT G. MCDONALD on behalf of Defendant DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (MCDONALD, MOFFATT)
June 17, 2019 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
June 17, 2019 Filing 64 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
May 30, 2019 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
May 21, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SCOTT E. FRICK on behalf of Defendant THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY (FRICK, SCOTT)
May 21, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney W. DAVID CONNER on behalf of Defendant THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY (CONNER, W.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MOFFATT G. MCDONALD on behalf of Defendant THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY (MCDONALD, MOFFATT)
May 21, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SCOTT E. FRICK on behalf of Defendants FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. (FRICK, SCOTT)
May 21, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney W. DAVID CONNER on behalf of Defendants FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. (CONNER, W.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MOFFATT G. MCDONALD on behalf of Defendants FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. (MCDONALD, MOFFATT)
May 14, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEPHANIE G. FLYNN on behalf of Defendant ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (FLYNN, STEPHANIE)
May 13, 2019 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VIKING PUMP, INC.. (DRAYTON, AMY)
May 13, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by VIKING PUMP, INC.. (DRAYTON, AMY)
May 10, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSEPH D. HAMMOND on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (HAMMOND, JOSEPH)
May 10, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CURTIS J. SHIPLEY on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (SHIPLEY, CURTIS)
May 10, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LESLIE C. PACKER on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (PACKER, LESLIE)
May 10, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
May 10, 2019 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
May 10, 2019 Filing 48 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
May 7, 2019 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOHN CRANE, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
May 6, 2019 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
May 6, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
May 6, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (OAKLEY, DAVID)
May 6, 2019 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY (OAKLEY, DAVID)
May 6, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID B. OAKLEY on behalf of Defendant THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY (OAKLEY, DAVID)
May 6, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JOHN CRANE, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
May 6, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by BW/IP, INC.. (RAUSCHER, CLAIRE)
May 6, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BW/IP, INC.. (RAUSCHER, CLAIRE)
May 6, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CLAIRE J. RAUSCHER on behalf of Defendant BW/IP, INC. (RAUSCHER, CLAIRE)
May 6, 2019 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
May 6, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
May 6, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney AMY C. DRAYTON on behalf of Defendant VIKING PUMP, INC. (DRAYTON, AMY)
May 3, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant ITT CORPORATION (STARR, WILLIAM)
May 3, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant GRINNELL LLC (STARR, WILLIAM)
May 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED (STARR, WILLIAM)
May 3, 2019 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant ITT CORPORATION by ITT CORPORATION.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
May 3, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ITT CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
May 3, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant ITT CORPORATION (TOMLIN, TRACY)
May 3, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GRINNELL LLC by GRINNELL LLC.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
May 3, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GRINNELL LLC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
May 3, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant GRINNELL LLC (TOMLIN, TRACY)
May 3, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED by GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
May 3, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
May 3, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRACY E. TOMLIN on behalf of Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED (TOMLIN, TRACY)
May 3, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CRANE CO.. (MATHER, EMILY)
May 2, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
May 2, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CBS CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
April 29, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARLA T. RESCHLY on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (RESCHLY, MARLA)
April 29, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CRANE CO. (MATHER, EMILY)
April 29, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EMILY K. MATHER on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (MATHER, EMILY)
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and to Cross-Claims of any and all other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEITH E. COLTRAIN on behalf of Defendant METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to BW/IP, INC. (Coyne, Michelle)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BENJAMIN D. BRALY on behalf of Plaintiffs DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL, KENNETH R. MCDANIEL (BRALY, BENJAMIN)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Coyne, Michelle)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
April 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
April 2, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2541863.), filed by Deborah J. McDaniel, Kenneth R. McDaniel.(GRAHAM, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCDANIEL, et al v. JOHN CRANE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIKING PUMP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COVIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILLS-MCCANNA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRONACO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH J. MCDANIEL
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH R. MCDANIEL
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?