LOBACZ v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, et al.
Plaintiff: Frank M Lobacz and FRANK M. LOBACZ
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00497
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: N C TILLEY
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss by FRANK M. LOBACZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby)
June 11, 2019 Filing 35 Roseboro Letter as to Plaintiff FRANK M. LOBACZ. Re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Taylor, Abby)
June 11, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM re #33 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Christina A. Kelley)(BAKER, STEVEN)
June 11, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Response to Motion due by 7/5/2019 (BAKER, STEVEN)
June 5, 2019 Set Answer Deadline: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA answer due 6/18/2019. (Taylor, Abby)
June 5, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. For good cause shown, Defendant shall have up to and including June 18, 2019 within which to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/5/2019.(Lee, Pedra)
June 5, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Winchester, Robin)
June 4, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAKER, STEVEN)
May 14, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 13, 2019 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:18-cv-61737. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 10, 2019 Case transferred to District of Middle District of North Carolina electronically per DE#29 (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Case is closed-transferred to NC ,Case Reopened in Error (mee) Text Modified on 5/13/2019 (mee). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Compliance re #29 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. (mailed to address listed on order) (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA; DISMISSING COUNT I AGAINST THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion for Summary Judgment. Closing Case. Motions Terminated: #14 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The United States of America, Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIRMATION by Frank M Lobacz (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed by The United States of America. (Petri, Steven) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 26 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Government's Motion to Dismiss the First Cause of Action and for Summary Judgment on the Second Cause of Action in the Complaint re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Frank M Lobacz. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #24 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response #14 Motion to Dismiss; Copy of Order Mailed to Plaintiff. (vmz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion #14 MOTION TO DISMISS. Responses due by 3/27/2019 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Government's Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss Count One and for Summary Judgment on Count Two as to #21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer,, by Frank M Lobacz. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Compliance re #21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer,, (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Re: #14 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The United States of America, Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10. Responses due by 3/22/2019 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Governments' Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss Count One and for Summary Judgment on Count Two as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Frank M Lobacz. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Re: #14 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The United States of America, Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10. Responses due by 3/15/2019 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/15/2019. (vty) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Frank M Lobacz. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's Notice of Compliance re 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Order mailed to plaintiff as instructed. (cbr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Re: #14 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The United States of America, Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10. Responses due by 2/15/2019. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to pro se Plaintiff at the address of record. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/14/2019. (vty) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Government's Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss Count One and for Summary Judgment on Count Two #14 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Frank M Lobacz. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 1/9/2019), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint ( Responses due by 1/9/2019), MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10, The United States of America. Attorney Steven R. Petri added to party Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10(pty:dft), Attorney Steven R. Petri added to party The United States of America(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Petri, Steven) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10 response due 1/4/2019. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #10 Summons Returned Executed. Docket Text Modified by Clerk. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Frank M Lobacz. Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10 served on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019 for image see De#10 . (mee) Modified on 11/7/2018 (mee). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Frank M Lobacz. The United States of America,C/O United States Attorney served on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Frank M Lobacz. Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10 served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 Order to Show Cause, by Frank M Lobacz. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Florida Bureau of Prisons. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 4(M) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. On or before November 6, 2018, Plaintiff shall either perfect service upon Defendants, show that service has already been made, or show good cause why service has not been perfected. Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2018. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/30/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/30/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The United States of America (cbr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/27/2018 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS000010738 (cbr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cbr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 Receipt#: FLS 000010738, filed by Frank M Lobacz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cbr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOBACZ v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank M Lobacz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK M. LOBACZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Steven R. Petri
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons (BOP) Medical and Other Staff John Does 1-10
Represented By: Steven R. Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?