YANG et al v. MARKET AMERICA, INC., et al
Plaintiff: OLLIE LAN, CHUANJIE YANG, LIU LIU and RUONING LAN
Defendant: MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE INC., MARC ASHLEY, JAMES HOWARD RIDINGER, DOES 1-100, LOREN RIDINGER and MARKET AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00502
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 154 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 7/25/2019 (Winchester, Robin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 153 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 7/25/2019 (Winchester, Robin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BLAKE J. LINDEMANN on behalf of Plaintiffs OLLIE LAN, LIU LIU, CHUANJIE YANG (LINDEMANN, BLAKE)
May 29, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LAWRENCE B STEINBERG on behalf of Defendants MARC ASHLEY, MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE INC., MARKET AMERICA, INC., JAMES HOWARD RIDINGER, LOREN RIDINGER (STEINBERG, LAWRENCE)
May 15, 2019 Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE reference related case 1:17-CV-897. MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
May 14, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 14, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 14, 2019 Filing 150 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Daren Schlecter, Blake Lindemann, & Laurence Steinberg. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 6/13/2019, (Attachments: #1 Lindemann, #2 Schlecter)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 13, 2019 Filing 149 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:17-cv-04012. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA ARBITRATION by Judge George H. Wu transferring case to Middle District of North Carolina. Case electronically transferred on 5/13/2019. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 147 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging, #142 filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/17/18 8:40 am; 4/15/19 8:48 am; 4/29/19 8:51 am re Transcript #144 , #145 , #143 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 145 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/29/19 8:51 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/15/19 8:48 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 143 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/17/18 8:40 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE OF LODGING filed OF PROPOSED ORDER re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 141 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court, as stated on the record, will transfer this action to the Middle District of North Carolina. Counsel for Defendant will file a proposed order within a week of this order. Counsel for Plaintiff will have two days to respond. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nataly Grande at nataly@lawbl.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger for Court Reporter. Court will contact Shirley Lee at slee@buchalter.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 138 STATUS REPORT (Plaintiffs' Status Report) filed by Plaintiff Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 137 STATUS REPORT (DEFENDANTS' STATUS REPORT) filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 136 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. For reasons stated on the record, the status conference is continued to April 29, 2019 at 8:30 a.m., with a joint report to be filed by noon on April 22, 2019. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nataly Grande at nataly@lawbl.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 134 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Market America Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Shirley Lee at slee@buchalter.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 133 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Status Conference Report filed by Plaintiff Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 132 STATUS REPORT (Defendants Status Report Re: North Carolina Action; Request For Judicial Notice) filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 ORDER OF NORTH CAROLINA COURT GRANTING PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (4-10-2019))(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 131 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the STATUS CONFERENCE previously scheduled for 04/04/2019 to 4/15/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #129 . (Status Conference continued to 4/4/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than two court days before the new date set for the Status Conference. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 129 STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from 2/28/2019 to 4/4/2019 Re: Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,, Motion Hearing,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #125 filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Class Plaintiffs Chuanjie Yang for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nataly Grande at Nataly@lawbl.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Market America Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Kellie Brandon at kbrandon@buchalter.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 125 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 #62 held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court will continue the stay over this matter to allow the federal court in North Carolina to issue decisions on the motions pending before it as it sees fit. The Court sets a status conference for February 28, 2019 at 8:30 a.m., with a joint status report to be filed by February 26, 2019. Court Reporter: Katie E Thibodeaux. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 128 **AMENDED** MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu re: Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #125 . (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 124 STATUS REPORT RE: NORTH CAROLINA ACTION; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #62 Supplemental Opposition filed by Plaintiff Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blake J. Lindemann)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 Defendants Further Supplemental Brief in support of motion filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Market America Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Kellie Brandon at kbrandon@buchalter.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 120 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 #62 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court continues Defendants' Motion to January 17, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel may file any supplemental brief by January 8, 2019. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER #117 by Judge George H. Wu that the hearing on defendants' motion to transfer this action to the Middle District of North Carolina or, alternatively, to stay or dismiss this action pending arbitration (Docket No. #39 ) is continued from 12/10/2018 to 12/17/2018 at 08:30 AM. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Continue, #117 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 117 STIPULATION to Continue HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER from 12/10/2018 to 1/28/2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 116 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 115 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 #62 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. For reasons stated on the record, the motion is continued to December 10, 2018 at 8:30 a.m., with a joint status report to be filed by December 4, 2018. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #113 . (Motion continued to10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 113 STIPULATION to Continue HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER from 9/27/2018 to 10/18/2018 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 112 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/1/18 8:36 am; 8/20/18 8:48 am re Transcript #109 , #110 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/20/18 8:48 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2018. (Thibodeaux, Katie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/1/18 8:36 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2018. (Thibodeaux, Katie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 108 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 #62 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. Based on the Tentative, and for reasons stated on the record, the motion is continued to September 27, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Parties are to submit a joint status report regarding the proceedings in North Carolina for September 24, 2018. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nataly Grande at Nataly@lawbl.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 106 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 (Defendants' Supplemental Cross-Brief) filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clement D. Erhardt)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 and request to Lift the Stay and Set Scheduling Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Blake J. Lindemann, #2 Exhibit 1-3)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 --- CORRECTED FILING (replaces Docket No. 102) filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION, OR, ALTERNATIVELY, STAY OR DISMISS PENDING ARBITRATION)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 (Supplemental Brief Filed Pursuant to Court Order) filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION OR, ALTERNATIVELY, STAY OR DISMISS PENDING ARBITRATION)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 101 STATUS REPORT (Plaintiffs' Status Report) filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 100 STATUS REPORT RE: NORTH CAROLINA ACTION; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER #98 by Judge George H. Wu as follows: (1) The parties will cross-file any supplemental briefing on defendants motion to transfer this action to the Middle District of North Carolina or, alternatively, to stay or dismiss this action pending arbitration (Docket No. #39 ; hereinafter, the Motion), limited to seven pages, on or before 8/2/2018; (2) The parties will file any responsive cross-briefs on the Motion,limited to five pages, on or before 8/10/2018;(3) The hearing on the Motion is continued from 7/16/2018 to 8/20/2018 at 8:30 AM. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 98 STIPULATION to Continue HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER from 7/16/2018 to 8/20/2018 Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,, Set/Reset Hearing,, #97 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu re: Stipulation to Continue, #96 . The Court has received the parties' Joint Stipulation to Continue Status Conference (Docket No. 96). It is denied. The Court reopens Defendants' Motion to Transfer Action to Middle District of North Carolina, which was taken under submission on September 28, 2017 (Docket No. 54). The parties will cross-file any supplemental briefing limited to seven pages by June 28 and responsive cross-briefs limited to five pages by July 6. The Status Conference now set for July 9 is taken off-calendar; and a further hearing on the Motion to Transfer is set for July 16, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 96 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from July 9, 2018 to October 8, 2018 Re: Stipulation and Order, Set/Reset Hearing #95 filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE #94 by Judge George H. Wu. It is hereby ordered The Status Conference in this case scheduled for April 2, 2018 is continued to July 9, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 94 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from April 2, 2018 to July 9, 2018 Re: Status Conference - optional html form,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #93 filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
February 2, 2018 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nataly Grande at Nataly@lawbl.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 93 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer re North Carolina action. The Court continues the status conference to April 2, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are to file a joint status report by noon on March 28, 2018. This action remains stayed pending the outcome in North Carolina. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeuax. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 91 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO SUSPEND THE LOCAL RULE 23-3 DATE by Judge George H. Wu re: #89 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File. The deadline to file a motion for class certification will be established at a scheduling conference, should one be held in this case. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
January 4, 2018 Filing 89 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Suspension of Rule 23-3 Deadline filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Blake J. Lindemann, #3 Proposed Order) (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
January 3, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/21/17 - a.m. session re Transcript #87 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gonzalez, Lisa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
January 3, 2018 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/21/17 - a.m. calendar. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Lisa M. Gonzalez, phone number 213-894-2979; csrlisag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2018. (Gonzalez, Lisa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 86 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Status Report due by 1/29/2018. Status Conference continued to 2/1/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pursuant to the request of Defendant's counsel, Docket No. 61 is stricken and the operative motion is Docket No. 62. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nataly Grande at nataly@lawbl.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger for Court Reporter. Court will contact Kellie Brandon at kbrandon@buchalter.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 83 STATUS REPORT (Unilateral) filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 82 STATUS REPORT RE: 12/21/17 STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
November 21, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/28/17 9:30 am; 11/6/17 9:30 am re Transcript #80 , #79 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
November 21, 2017 Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/6/17 9:30 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2018. (Thibodeaux, Katie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
November 21, 2017 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/28/17 9:30 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2018. (Thibodeaux, Katie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nataly Grande at nataly@lawbl.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
November 8, 2017 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger for Court Reporter. Court will contact Kellie Brandon at kbrandon@buchalter.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 76 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re North Carolina action. For reasons stated on the record, Defendants' Motion #61 set for November 16, 2017, is TAKEN OFF-CALENDAR. The status conference is continued to December 21, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. A joint status report regarding the North Carolina action is to be filed by noon on December 19, 2017. Counsel may appear telephonically provided advanced notice is given to the clerk. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 75 REPLY in support of Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #62 filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jonathon D Townsend counsel for Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. Filed by defendants Market America, Inc., Market America Worldwide, Inc., James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger and Marc Ashley. (Townsend, Jonathon) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 73 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Lawrence B Steinberg counsel for Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. Filed by defendants Market America, Inc., Market America Worldwide, Inc., James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger and Marc Ashley. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 72 Evidentiary Objections and Request To Strike Opposition re: Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #61 , Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #62 filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 71 EXHIBIT I-Q to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #61 , Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #62 filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L: Declaration of Chuanjie Yang, #4 Exhibit M: Declaration of Ollie Lan, #5 Exhibit N: Declaration of Liu Liu, #6 Exhibit O: Declaration of Blake J. Lindemann, #7 Exhibit P: Declaration of Robert L. Fitzpatrick, #8 Exhibit Q)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 70 EXHIBIT D-H to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #61 , Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #62 filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 69 EXHIBIT A (part 3) -C to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #61 , Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #62 filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 68 OPPOSITION to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #61 , Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #62 Response Compendium of Exhibits In Support of Opposition To Motion To Compel Arbitration (part 1) filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1), #2 Exhibit A (part 1))(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #61 , Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #62 filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 66 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Unilateral Status Report filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 65 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REGARDING EX PARTE TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge George H. Wu re: #63 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File. 1. The Motion is GRANTED. 2. The schedule for Plaintiffs' class certification motion is as follows: Motion Filed: February 26, 2018; Oppositions Filed: March 19, 2018; Replies Filed: April 9, 2018; Hearing: April 23, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 24, 2017 Filing 63 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File To File Motion For Class Certification and Continue Briefing Date and Deadlines filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Point and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Blake J. Lindemann, #3 Proposed Order) (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 9, 2017 Filing 62 Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY, DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE, #2 Declaration of Eugene Wallace (Docket No. 39-1), #3 Declaration of Clement D. Erhardt (Docket No. 39-2), #4 Declaration of Jonathon D. Townsend (Docket No. 39-3), #5 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY, DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE) (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 9, 2017 Filing 61 DOCUMENT ORDERED STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 86] Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY, DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE, #2 Declaration of Eugene Wallace (Docket No. 39-1), #3 Declaration of Clement D. Erhardt (Docket No. 39-2), #4 Declaration of Jonathon D. Townsend (Docket No. 39-3), #5 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY, DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE) (Steinberg, Lawrence) Modified on 12/22/2017 (mrgo). [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Class Plaintiffs Liu Liu, Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. upon James Howard Ridinger waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Lawrence B. Steinberg. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Class Plaintiffs Liu Liu, Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. upon Loren Ridinger waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Lawrence B. Steinberg. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Class Plaintiffs Liu Liu, Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. upon Marc Ashley waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Lawrence B. Steinberg. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Class Plaintiffs Liu Liu, Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. upon Market America Worldwide Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Lawrence B. Steinberg. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Class Plaintiffs Liu Liu, Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. upon Market America Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Lawrence B. Steinberg. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #42 To Declaration of Chuanjie Yang [Dkt. No. 42-1] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT ORDER Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger for Court Reporter. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
September 28, 2017 Filing 54 MINUTES by Judge George H. Wu: The Courts Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, Defendants motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling. A Status Conference is set for November 6, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will file a report by October 26, 2017. (yl) Modified on 10/6/2017 (yl). [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 52 DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF RECENTLY DECIDED AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STRIKING DECLARATIONS OF PLAINTIFF CHUANJIE YANG OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REQUIRING PRODUCTION OF ORIGINAL YANG DECLARATIONS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 5-4.3.4(b) by Judge George H. Wu re: #50 EX PARTE APPLICATION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: The Application is GRANTED. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.3.4(b), plaintiffs'counsel shall produce to the Court, and shall make available for inspection by Defendants' counsel, no later than 8:00 a.m. on September 28, 2017, the two original hand-signed declarations of plaintiff Chuanjie Yang (Docket Nos. 27, 42-1) filed in opposition to Defendants' motion to compel arbitration and in opposition to Defendants' motion to transfer this action to the Middle District of North Carolina. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
September 8, 2017 Filing 50 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike DECLARATIONS OF PLAINTIFF CHUANJIE YANG OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REQUIRING PRODUCTION OF ORIGINAL YANG DECLARATIONS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 5-4.3.4(b) Declaration (Motion related) #27 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #42 filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF JONATHON D. TOWNSEND, #2 PROPOSED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STRIKING DECLARATIONS OF PLAINTIFF CHUANJIE YANG OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REQUIRING PRODUCTION OF ORIGINAL YANG DECLARATIONS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 5-4.3.4(b)) (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #48 . (Motion reset for hearing on 9/28/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 48 STIPULATION to Continue HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER from 9/14/2017 to 9/28/2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 25, 2017 Filing 47 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge George H. Wu. On the Court's own motion, the Court continues the MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 , from 8/31/2017 to Thursday, 9/14/2017 at 8:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 46 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 45 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 Evidentiary Objection and Request To Strike, Portions of the Declaration of Eugene Wallace and Clement Erhardt filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Robert L. Fitzpatrick In Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Blake J. Lindemann In Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3), #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Index of Exhibits)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #39 filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chuanjie Yang, #2 Declaration of Ollie Lan, #3 Declaration of Liu Liu)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REGARDING EX PARTE MOTION [UNOPPOSED] TO ESTABLISH BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND DEADLINES FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge George H. Wu re: #38 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Motion is GRANTED. 2. The schedule for Plaintiffs class certification motion is as follows: Motion Filed: November 26, 2017; Oppositions Filed: December 17, 2017; Replies Filed: January 8, 2018; Hearing: January 22, 2018. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #36 Non-Resident Attorney Pressly M. Millen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Market America Inc., Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger and Marc Ashley, designating Lawrence B Steinberg as local counsel. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of North Carolina OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Wallace, #2 Declaration of Clement D. Erhardt, #3 Declaration of Jonathon D. Townsend, #4 Proposed Order GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION) (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 38 Renewed EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File Motion For Class Certification and Briefing Schedule [Unopposed] filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Blake J. Lindemann, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service) (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Pressly M. Millen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0 #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 36 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Pressly M. Millen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No . 0973-20283814) filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER by Judge George H. Wu re: #19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. On July 20, 2017, Plaintiffs filed a First Amended Complaint. In light of that filing, the Operative Complaint is no longer the original complaint. As such, the Court VACATES Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint or Stay Proceedings, Or, in the Alternative, Transfer to the Middle District of North Carolina #19 , filed on June 29, 2017, and set for July 31, 2017. (mrgo)[Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE Of Filing First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Liu Liu, Chuanjie Yang. with Proof of Service (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 33 First Amended Class Action Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang, Liu Liu(Attorney Blake J Lindemann added to party Liu Liu(pty:pla))(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 17, 2017 Filing 32 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #19 filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Jonathon D. Townsend, #2 Declaration of Clement D. Erhardt, #3 Supplemental Declaration of Eugene Wallace)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu re: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, #30 . The Stipulation is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Parties can resubmit, if necessary after Court rules on motion to compel arbitration. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 30 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order REGARDING EXTENSION OF LOCAL RULE 23-3 DEADLINE)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Blake J. Lindemann In Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #19 filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit A (part 1), #6 Exhibit A (part 2), #7 Exhibit A (part 3))(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Class Plaintiff Ollie Lan In Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #19 filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 27 [DOCUMENT ORDERED STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 51] DECLARATION of Class Plaintiff Chuanjie Yang In Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #19 filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) Modified on 9/13/2017 (mrgo). [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 26 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #19 Evidentiary Objection and Request To Strike, Portions of the Declaration of Eugene Wallace filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #19 with Proof of Service filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Having considered Plaintiffs' ex parte application to continue the hearing date for the motion to compel arbitration and Defendants' opposition thereto (both of which are based in part on the trial schedules of the respective counsel), the Court hereby orders that the motion will remain on July 31, 2017 and will be submitted without oral argument as of that date. If the Court finds that it needs oral argument, it will notify the parties and a hearing date that is acceptable to both sides will be selected. If the parties jointly stipulate and notify the Court in writing by July 24 that they are available and want to present oral arguments on July 31, the Court will accommodate them. (cr) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 6, 2017 Filing 23 REPLY In Support of Motion EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing On Motion To Compel Arbitration from July 31, 2017 to August 14, 2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #19 #20 with Proof of Service filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 5, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger, (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 5, 2017 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing On Motion To Compel Arbitration from July 31, 2017 to August 14, 2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #19 #20 filed by Defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence B. Steinberg in Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration of Clement Erhardt, #3 Proposed Order)(Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
July 3, 2017 Filing 20 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing On Motion To Compel Arbitration from July 31, 2017 to August 14, 2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #19 filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Blake J. Lindemann with Exhbiit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service) (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 29, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. Motion set for hearing on 7/31/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene Wallace (with Exhibits A-H), #2 Declaration of Jonathon Townsend (with Exhibit A), #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion To Compel Arbitration And Dismiss Complaint Or Stay Proceedings, Or, In The Alternative, Transfer To The Middle District Of North Carolina) (Attorney Lawrence B Steinberg added to party Marc Ashley(pty:dft), Attorney Lawrence B Steinberg added to party Market America Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Lawrence B Steinberg added to party Market America Worldwide Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Lawrence B Steinberg added to party James Howard Ridinger(pty:dft), Attorney Lawrence B Steinberg added to party Loren Ridinger(pty:dft)) (Steinberg, Lawrence) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu: You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (cr) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-04012 GW(JEMx). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Marc Ashley, Market America Inc, Market America Worldwide Inc, James Howard Ridinger, Loren Ridinger. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #12 , Summons Request #9 , Summons Request #10 , Summons Request #13 , Summons Request #7 , Summons Request #11 , Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. THE ATTACHMENT on all the summons NAMES: Marty Weissman and Dennis Franks, these two parties are NOT named defendants in the Complaint.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
May 31, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
May 31, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang, (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Class Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Ollie Lan, Chuanjie Yang. (Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19934749 - Fee: $400, filed by Class Plaintiffs Chuanjie Yang, Ollie Lan. (Attorney Blake J Lindemann added to party Ollie Lan(pty:pla), Attorney Blake J Lindemann added to party Chuanjie Yang(pty:pla))(Lindemann, Blake) [Transferred from California Central on 5/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YANG et al v. MARKET AMERICA, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLLIE LAN
Represented By: BLAKE J. LINDEMANN
Represented By: DAREN M SCHLECTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHUANJIE YANG
Represented By: BLAKE J. LINDEMANN
Represented By: DAREN M SCHLECTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIU LIU
Represented By: BLAKE J. LINDEMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUONING LAN
Represented By: BLAKE J. LINDEMANN
Represented By: DAREN M SCHLECTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKET AMERICA WORLDWIDE INC.
Represented By: LAWRENCE B STEINBERG
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Represented By: JONATHON D. TOWNSEND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARC ASHLEY
Represented By: LAWRENCE B STEINBERG
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Represented By: JONATHON D. TOWNSEND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES HOWARD RIDINGER
Represented By: LAWRENCE B STEINBERG
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Represented By: JONATHON D. TOWNSEND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOREN RIDINGER
Represented By: LAWRENCE B STEINBERG
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Represented By: JONATHON D. TOWNSEND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKET AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: LAWRENCE B STEINBERG
Represented By: PRESSLY M MILLEN
Represented By: JONATHON D. TOWNSEND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?