UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CALDWELL
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JENNIFER CALDWELL
Case Number: 1:2019cv00505
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Rule 16 and 26 Deadlines, #9 Joint MOTION to Correct Caption, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
July 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 8/15/2019 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Rule 16 and 26 Deadlines by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BISHOP, KYLE)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Correct Caption by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BISHOP, KYLE)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JENNIFER CALDWELL. (RYAN, KEVIN)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 7/25/2019 (Winchester, Robin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. JENNIFER CALDWELL waiver sent on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (BISHOP, KYLE)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEVIN J. RYAN on behalf of Defendant JENNIFER CALDWELL (RYAN, KEVIN)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW L. RODENBOUGH on behalf of Defendant JENNIFER CALDWELL (RODENBOUGH, ANDREW)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JENNIFER CALDWELL. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 14, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 14, 2019 Case assigned to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JENNIFER CALDWELL, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BISHOP, KYLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CALDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER CALDWELL
Represented By: KEVIN J. RYAN
Represented By: ANDREW L. RODENBOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: KYLE L BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?