NORTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. v. STRICKLAND'S AUTO & TRUCK REPAIRS, INC.
Plaintiff: NORTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: STRICKLAND'S AUTO & TRUCK REPAIRS, INC.
3Rd Party Defendant: LISA BASSETT, BASSETT GUTTERS AND MORE, INC., RONLAD WESLEY BASSETT and BR RACING, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00513
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to LISA BASSETT, RONLAD WESLEY BASSETT, BASSETT GUTTERS AND MORE, INC., BR RACING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Lisa Bassett, #2 Summons issued to Bassett Gutters and More, Inc., #3 Summons issued to BR Racing, LLC) (Garland, Leah)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RICHARD LEONARD PINTO on behalf of Defendant STRICKLAND'S AUTO & TRUCK REPAIRS, INC., STRICKLAND'S AUTO & TRUCK REPAIRS, INC. (PINTO, RICHARD)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ronald Wesley Bassett, Lisa Bassett, Bassett Gutters and More, Inc., BR Racing, LLC by STRICKLAND'S AUTO & TRUCK REPAIRS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- NC Farm Bureau's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Bassetts' Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3- Release, #4 Exhibit 4- Bassetts' dismissal)(FELICIANO, LENNEKA)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to STRICKLAND'S AUTO & TRUCK REPAIRS, INC. served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service)(POWELL, LINDSEY)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LINDSEY E. POWELL on behalf of Plaintiff NORTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. (POWELL, LINDSEY)
May 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to STRICKLAND'S AUTO & TRUCK REPAIRS, INC. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff NORTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. (JONES, TODD)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TODD ALLEN JONES on behalf of Plaintiff NORTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. (JONES, TODD)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STRICKLAND'S AUTO & TRUCK REPAIRS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2570365.), filed by NORTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JONES, TODD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. v. STRICKLAND'S AUTO & TRUCK REPAIRS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: STRICKLAND'S AUTO & TRUCK REPAIRS, INC.
Represented By: LENNEKA HINTON FELICIANO
Represented By: RICHARD LEONARD PINTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: TODD ALLEN JONES
Represented By: LINDSEY E. POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: LISA BASSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BASSETT GUTTERS AND MORE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: RONLAD WESLEY BASSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BR RACING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?