HILL v. MALLINCKRODT LLC et al
Plaintiff: JAMES M. HILL, JR.
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC, SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC. and WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00532
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Motion Submitted: #8 MOTION to Dismiss to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY, filed by Defendant MALLINCKRODT LLC, to Response to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MALLINCKRODT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation of Dismissal)(DIXON, JOSHUA)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MALLINCKRODT LLC filed by JAMES M. HILL, JR. Replies due by 7/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(HOLDER, JONATHAN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.. (LAMBETH, CARTER)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.. (LAMBETH, CARTER)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CARTER T. LAMBETH on behalf of Defendant SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC. (LAMBETH, CARTER)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY. (LEACH, MARK)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant MALLINCKRODT LLC by MALLINCKRODT LLC.(DIXON, JOSHUA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant MALLINCKRODT LLC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MALLINCKRODT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - South Carolina Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Deposition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Certification, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Debbie's Staffing Servs. v. Highpoint Risk Servs, LLC, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Medport, Inc. v. Williams, Inc., #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Smith v. 3M Co.)(DIXON, JOSHUA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by MALLINCKRODT LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/5/2019 (DIXON, JOSHUA)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY. (LEACH, MARK)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY. (LEACH, MARK)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LISA W. SHIRLEY on behalf of Plaintiff JAMES M. HILL, JR (SHIRLEY, LISA)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN M. HOLDER on behalf of Plaintiff JAMES M. HILL, JR (HOLDER, JONATHAN)
May 22, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MALLINCKRODT LLC, SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC., WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Weyerhaeuser, #2 Southern)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2574463.), filed by James M Hill, Jr.(GRAHAM, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. MALLINCKRODT LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.
Represented By: CARTER T. LAMBETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY
Represented By: MARK A. LEACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES M. HILL, JR.
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Represented By: JONATHAN M. HOLDER
Represented By: LISA W. SHIRLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?