EDUCATIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION v. CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC
Plaintiff: EDUCATIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Defendant: CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00537
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by EDUCATIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION re #1 Complaint,, #4 Affidavit of Service of Consent to Extension (SUMNER, LISA)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (SUMNER, LISA)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC. (Garland, Leah)
May 23, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolina Automotive Group LLC d/b/a Carolina Kia of High Point and Carolina Hyundai of High Point ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2575468.), filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 07/17/2018 Notice Prior to Wage Withholding, #2 Exhibit B - 8/21/2018 Order of Withholding, #3 Exhibit C - 10/5/2018 Second Notice Order of Withholding from Earnings, #4 Exhibit D - 1/7/2019 Notice of Employer Non-Compliance to Carolina Kia Hyundai, #5 Exhibit E - 3/26/2019 Fourth Demand for Compliance, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit Summons)(SUMNER, LISA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDUCATIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION v. CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLINA AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDUCATIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: LISA P. SUMNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?