THE CITY OF HIGH POINT, NORTH CAROLINA v. SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC. et al

Plaintiff: THE CITY OF HIGH POINT, NORTH CAROLINA
Defendant: FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, CPPE CARBON PROCESS & PLANT ENGINEERING S.A. and SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC.
3Rd Party Defendant: HAZEN & SAWYER, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00540
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC. identifying Corporate Parent SUEZ WATER TECHNOLOGIES AND SOLUTIONS SA, Corporate Parent SUEZ GROUPE SAS, Corporate Parent CAISSE DE DEPOT ET PLACEMENT DU QUEBEC, Corporate Parent SUEZ SA for SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC., SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC., SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC... (WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against HAZEN & SAWYER, P.C., Counterclaim against Plaintiff against by SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-City RFP, #2 Exhibit Ex. B-SUEZ Proposal, #3 Exhibit Ex. C-City Purchase Order, #4 Exhibit Ex. D-Letter Agreement, #5 Exhibit Ex. E-Letter SUEZ to H&S re Burners and Risk, #6 Exhibit Ex. F-SUEZ Invoice)(WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-City RFP, #2 Exhibit Ex. B-SUEZ Proposal, #3 Exhibit Ex. C-Letter Agreement)(WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC.. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2019 (WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS on behalf of Defendant SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC. (WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL DAVID PHILLIPS on behalf of Defendant SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by THE CITY OF HIGH POINT, NORTH CAROLINA. SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC. waiver sent on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (PIERCE, WHITNEY)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WHITNEY D. PIERCE on behalf of Plaintiff THE CITY OF HIGH POINT, NORTH CAROLINA (PIERCE, WHITNEY)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CPPE CARBON PROCESS & PLANT ENGINEERING S.A., FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC. (Attachments: #1 CPPE, #2 SUEZ)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 24, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CPPE CARBON PROCESS & PLANT ENGINEERING S.A., FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2575618.), filed by THE CITY OF HIGH POINT, NORTH CAROLINA.(ASHLEY, BRUCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE CITY OF HIGH POINT, NORTH CAROLINA v. SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CITY OF HIGH POINT, NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: BRUCE P. ASHLEY
Represented By: WHITNEY D. PIERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPPE CARBON PROCESS & PLANT ENGINEERING S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUEZ TREATMENT SOLUTIONS INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID PHILLIPS
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: HAZEN & SAWYER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?