MEATH et al v. EVENTBRITE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: AMELIA MEATH and NICK SANBORN
Defendant: EVENTBRITE, INC. and TICKETFLY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00546
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMELIA MEATH, NICK SANBORN. TICKETFLY, LLC waiver sent on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (STEVENS, ERIC)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMELIA MEATH, NICK SANBORN. EVENTBRITE, INC. waiver sent on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (STEVENS, ERIC)
May 30, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Cosent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EVENTBRITE, INC., and TICKETFLY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 EVENTBRITE)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ERIC P. STEVENS on behalf of Plaintiffs AMELIA MEATH, NICK SANBORN (STEVENS, ERIC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2577107.), filed by AMELIA MEATH, NICK SANBORN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(STEVENS, ERIC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEATH et al v. EVENTBRITE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVENTBRITE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TICKETFLY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMELIA MEATH
Represented By: ERIC P. STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICK SANBORN
Represented By: ERIC P. STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?