US FOODS, INC. v. PIT BOSS, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: US FOODS, INC.
Defendant: Pit Boss, LLC d/b/a Tyler's Restaurant and Taproom, Daniel Kulenic II, Tyler Huntington, DANIEL KULENIC, II and PIT BOSS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00564
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by KIRK ALAN PARRY, JR (PARRY, KIRK)
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by TYLER HUNTINGTON. (HENDREN, JASON)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by PIT BOSS, LLC. (HENDREN, JASON)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney REBECCA F. REDWINE on behalf of Defendant PIT BOSS, LLC (REDWINE, REBECCA)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JASON LANIER HENDREN on behalf of Defendant PIT BOSS, LLC (HENDREN, JASON)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney COLIN D. W. DAILEY on behalf of Plaintiff US FOODS, INC. (DAILEY, COLIN)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for DANIEL KULENIC, II. Answer due by 8/5/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 7/3/2019. (Brubaker, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DANIEL KULENIC, II. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PARRY, KIRK)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KIRK ALAN PARRY, JR on behalf of Defendant DANIEL KULENIC, II (PARRY, KIRK)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for TYLER HUNTINGTON. Answer due by 8/1/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 07/01/2019. (Brubaker, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by TYLER HUNTINGTON. (HENDREN, JASON)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney REBECCA F. REDWINE on behalf of Defendant TYLER HUNTINGTON (REDWINE, REBECCA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JASON LANIER HENDREN on behalf of Defendant TYLER HUNTINGTON (HENDREN, JASON)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Process Server as to DANIEL KULENIC, II served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (SIDBURY, BENJAMIN)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Process Server as to TYLER HUNTINGTON served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (SIDBURY, BENJAMIN)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Process Server as to PIT BOSS, LLC served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (SIDBURY, BENJAMIN)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARIA Z. VATHIS on behalf of Plaintiff US FOODS, INC. (VATHIS, MARIA)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TYLER HUNTINGTON, DANIEL KULENIC, II, PIT BOSS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Tyler Huntington, #2 Summons issued to Daniel Kulenic II) (Garland, Leah)
June 6, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Garland, Leah)
June 6, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. (SIDBURY, BENJAMIN)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2580958), filed by US FOODS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Agreement), #2 Exhibit B (Unpaid Invoices)) (SIDBURY, BENJAMIN) Modified on 6/4/2019 to remove duplicate text. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US FOODS, INC. v. PIT BOSS, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pit Boss, LLC d/b/a Tyler's Restaurant and Taproom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kulenic II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Huntington
Represented By: JASON LANIER HENDREN
Represented By: REBECCA F. REDWINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL KULENIC, II
Represented By: KIRK ALAN PARRY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIT BOSS, LLC
Represented By: JASON LANIER HENDREN
Represented By: REBECCA F. REDWINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US FOODS, INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN FREEDMAN SIDBURY
Represented By: COLIN D. W. DAILEY
Represented By: MARIA Z. VATHIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?