JTH TAX, INC. v. STOICA et al

Plaintiff: JTH TAX, INC.
Defendant: MA'S CONSULTING GROUP, LLC, MARK ADEL and CAMELIA STOICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00568
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time TO PERMIT ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ESTABLISH DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by MARK ADEL, MA'S CONSULTING GROUP, LLC, CAMELIA STOICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(VAN CAMP, THOMAS)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MARK ADEL, MA'S CONSULTING GROUP, LLC, CAMELIA STOICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Mark Adel, #2 Summons issued to Ma's Consulting) (Garland, Leah)
June 6, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garland, Leah)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff JTH TAX, INC.. (DIXON, JOSHUA)
June 5, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JTH TAX, INC. (Filing fee $400.00 paid. Receipt number: 0418-2579082) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6069 Franchise Agreement NC 106, #2 Exhibit B - 6069 Cameilia Stoica Franchise Application, #3 Exhibit C - Stoica and Adel Notice of Intent, #4 Exhibit D - NTCs and Tracking, #5 Exhibit E - Term Notice, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(DIXON, JOSHUA) Modified on 6/5/2019 to update payment information. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH TAX, INC. v. STOICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH TAX, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MA'S CONSULTING GROUP, LLC
Represented By: THOMAS M. VAN CAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ADEL
Represented By: THOMAS M. VAN CAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMELIA STOICA
Represented By: THOMAS M. VAN CAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?