ARCHIE et al v. SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC et al

Plaintiff: TRAVIS EVANS, JOSHUA NOEL, TIFFANY BLACKWELL, JIMMY RICHBURG, ASIA ARCHIE, DERIK MCGEE, ROBERT R. ROSS, DEMETRIAS PHIPPS, CHARLENE MCLAMB, STACI FLORENCE, BONNIE DENNIS, SHENAYRA BURCHETTE, TRACEY BARNES, EDNA MITCHUM, SHEMEKA ALLRED, JOVANI GARCIA, TIMOTHY PARSONS, KIMBERLY FULLER, WILLIE WATLINGTON, TINA JONES, ERICA BRANDON, WILLIE BURCHETTE, TANITA JONES, DONOVAN HAWKINS, OSCAR WILLOUGHBY, JR., TAVARES BARRINO, RONALD KIMBER, CINDY HIGH, BRITTANY WALKER SMITH, PHYLLIS DAYE, THOMAS YOUNG and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: LOANMAX, LLC, ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC and KIPLING FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00575
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Rescheduling: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 9/19/2019 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES re #19 Statement: All pending deadlines are suspended pending a status report due August 15, 2019, subject to further order of the Court. The initial pre-trial conference will be rescheduled for the Magistrate Judges next date after August 15, 2019. (Sanders, Marlene)
July 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED RE: #19 Statement to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Sanders, Marlene)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 STATEMENT of CASE STATUS Joint Statement by Defendants ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, KIPLING FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, LOANMAX, LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 7/25/2019 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint Counterclaim by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (FAUCHER, JAMES)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Complaint,, , Counterclaim against by SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC, ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, KIPLING FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, LOANMAX, LLC. (LAWSON, CATHERINE)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
June 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (State Court document originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 19CVS5319, issued 5/2/2019, docketed as Exhibit A to #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STACI FLORENCE, DONOVAN HAWKINS, TINA JONES, ROBERT R. ROSS, BONNIE DENNIS, ASIA ARCHIE, RONALD KIMBER, WILLIE BURCHETTE, PHYLLIS DAYE, TIMOTHY PARSONS, TRACEY BARNES, TAVARES BARRINO, DERIK MCGEE, SHENAYRA BURCHETTE, TIFFANY BLACKWELL, JIMMY RICHBURG, WILLIE WATLINGTON, JOSHUA NOEL, TANITA JONES, KIMBERLY FULLER, THOMAS YOUNG, TRAVIS EVANS, DEMETRIAS PHIPPS, BRITTANY WALKER SMITH, ERICA BRANDON, JOVANI GARCIA, OSCAR WILLOUGHBY, JR, EDNA MITCHUM, CHARLENE MCLAMB, SHEMEKA ALLRED, CINDY HIGH. (State Court document originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 19CVS5319, docketed as Exhibit A to #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
June 7, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garland, Leah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD on behalf of Defendants Anderson Financial Services, LLC, Kipling Financial Services, LLC, LoanMax, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC (ARROWOOD, CATHARINE)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON on behalf of Defendants Anderson Financial Services, LLC, Kipling Financial Services, LLC, LoanMax, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC (LAWSON, CATHERINE)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MELANIE BLACK DUBIS on behalf of Defendants Anderson Financial Services, LLC, Kipling Financial Services, LLC, LoanMax, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Management Resources, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Title Loans, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LoanSmart, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LoanMax, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kipling Financial Services, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anderson Financial Services, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Kenneth R. Wayco re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendants Anderson Financial Services, LLC, Kipling Financial Services, LLC, LoanMax, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2584364.)(Related Case # 1:19-cv-321; 1:19-cv-325; 1:19-cv-519), filed by Select Management Resources, LLC, Anderson Financial Services, LLC, Kipling Financial Services, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, LoanMax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and Summonses, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Process)(DUBIS, MELANIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARCHIE et al v. SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOANMAX, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOANSMART, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIPLING FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS EVANS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA NOEL
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY BLACKWELL
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY RICHBURG
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASIA ARCHIE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERIK MCGEE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT R. ROSS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIAS PHIPPS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLENE MCLAMB
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACI FLORENCE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONNIE DENNIS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHENAYRA BURCHETTE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY BARNES
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDNA MITCHUM
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEMEKA ALLRED
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOVANI GARCIA
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY PARSONS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY FULLER
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE WATLINGTON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA JONES
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERICA BRANDON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE BURCHETTE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANITA JONES
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONOVAN HAWKINS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSCAR WILLOUGHBY, JR.
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAVARES BARRINO
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD KIMBER
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY HIGH
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTANY WALKER SMITH
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS DAYE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS YOUNG
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?