DUCHAC v. CENGAGE LEARNING, INC.

Plaintiff: JONATHAN DUCHAC
Defendant: CENGAGE LEARNING, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00581
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/25/2019; that the Consent Motion [Doc. #12 ] is GRANTED, and Defendant shall have an extension through and including August 14, 2019, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 16, 2019 Motion Referred re: #12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Welch, Kelly)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ANTHONY, KEITH)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. Answer due by 7/15/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 06/13/2019. (Brubaker, John)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint, by CENGAGE LEARNING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order granting extension)(ANTHONY, KEITH)
June 11, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JENNIFER P. MCARDLE on behalf of Defendant CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. (MCARDLE, JENNIFER)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GLENN C. EDWARDS on behalf of Defendant CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. (EDWARDS, GLENN)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES F. RITTINGER on behalf of Defendant CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. (RITTINGER, JAMES)
June 10, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN T. KIVUS on behalf of Defendant CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. (KIVUS, JOHN)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. (Original document issued in Forsyth County Superior Court on 5/9/2019 in Case Number 19CVS2815 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against CENGAGE LEARNING, INC., filed by JONATHAN DUCHAC. (Original document filed in Forsyth County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS2815 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. (ANTHONY, KEITH)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEITH P. ANTHONY on behalf of Defendant CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. (ANTHONY, KEITH)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL JONATHAN DUCHAC against CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2585944.), filed by CENGAGE LEARNING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(ANTHONY, KEITH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUCHAC v. CENGAGE LEARNING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN DUCHAC
Represented By: PETER JOSEPH JURAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENGAGE LEARNING, INC.
Represented By: KEITH P. ANTHONY
Represented By: JOHN T. KIVUS
Represented By: JAMES F. RITTINGER
Represented By: JENNIFER P. MCARDLE
Represented By: GLENN C. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?