BALLENTINE, JR. et al v. WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION et al
Plaintiff: LYNTON YATES BALLENTINE, JR. and LB INTERNATIONAL EXPRESS TRUST
Defendant: SHAPIRO AND INGLE, LLP, DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE, CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY, SATTERFIELD LEGAL, PLLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and GINNIE MAE AS TRUSTEE FOR SECURITIZED TRUST GUARANTEED REMIC PASS-THROUGH SECURITIES 2006-040 TRUST
Case Number: 1:2019cv00589
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Motions Submitted: #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
July 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Substitution of Counsel (KLAUER, LYNNE)
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 Roseboro Letter regarding Right to Respond to #20 Motion to Dismiss. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (application to proceed IFP), #2 Exhibit B (Foreclosure Order), #3 Exhibit C (Order denying TRO), #4 Exhibit D (Trustee's Deed))(PURSER, JASON) Modified on 7/24/2019 to edit document title and terminate incorrectly set deadline - wrong event used. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY, SATTERFIELD LEGAL, PLLC, SHAPIRO AND INGLE, LLP. Response to Motion due by 8/19/2019 (PURSER, JASON)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE entitled Memorandum in Response to Letter from Clerk re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, filed by LB INTERNATIONAL EXPRESS TRUST. Replies due by 7/18/2019. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Reissued as to CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 Roseboro Letter regarding #13 Motion to Dismiss. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 Corrected document re #14 Memorandum. (EWING, BAXTER)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BAXTER CHAD EWING on behalf of Defendant WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (EWING, BAXTER)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (EWING, BAXTER)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Response to Motion due by 7/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit C - LB Deed, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment of Deed of Trust)(EWING, BAXTER)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Response by LYNTON YATES BALLENTINE, JR., LB INTERNATIONAL EXPRESS TRUST re #1 Petition for Removal. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake on 06/18/2019, that the Motions for Extension of Time #7 and #10 are GRANTED, and that the time to respond to the Complaint for the Trustee Defendants and for Defendant Champion Mortgage is hereby enlarged until and including July 30, 2019. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 14, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Sanders, Marlene)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, by CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PURSER, JASON)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JASON K. PURSER on behalf of Defendant CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY (PURSER, JASON)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
June 14, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Sanders, Marlene)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, by SATTERFIELD LEGAL, PLLC, SHAPIRO AND INGLE, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PURSER, JASON)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JASON K. PURSER on behalf of Defendants SATTERFIELD LEGAL, PLLC, SHAPIRO AND INGLE, LLP (PURSER, JASON)
June 13, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY, GINNIE MAE AS TRUSTEE FOR SECURITIZED TRUST GUARANTEED REMIC PASS-THROUGH SECURITIES 2006-040 TRUST, SATTERFIELD LEGAL, PLLC, SHAPIRO AND INGLE, LLP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Original document issued in Forsyth County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS3234 ON 06/03/2019 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LYNTON YATES BALLENTINE, JR., LB INTERNATIONAL EXPRESS TRUST. (Original documents filed in Forsyth County Superior Court, Case number 19CVS3234 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to State Court of Filing Petition for Removal by Defendant United States of America (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(STRUP, NATHAN)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL of Complaint against United States of America, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(STRUP, NATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BALLENTINE, JR. et al v. WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO AND INGLE, LLP
Represented By: JASON K. PURSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY
Represented By: JASON K. PURSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SATTERFIELD LEGAL, PLLC
Represented By: JASON K. PURSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: BAXTER CHAD EWING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: NATHAN L. STRUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINNIE MAE AS TRUSTEE FOR SECURITIZED TRUST GUARANTEED REMIC PASS-THROUGH SECURITIES 2006-040 TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNTON YATES BALLENTINE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LB INTERNATIONAL EXPRESS TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?