RODRIGUEZ PEREZ v. MCALEENAN et al
Plaintiff: ROSA VERONICA RODRIGUEZ PEREZ
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, WILLIAM BARR, LAURA ZUCHOWSKI and KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00592
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEVEN N. BAKER on behalf of Defendants WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, LAURA ZUCHOWSKI (BAKER, STEVEN)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service WILLIAM BARR, Attorney General served on 6/24/2019; Answer due by 8/23/2019. (Daniel, J)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI served on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; KEVIN K. MCALEENAN served on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; LAURA ZUCHOWSKI served on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. as to (Attachments: #1 return receipts)(TARPEY, CAROLINE)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to WILLIAM BARR served on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. as to Matthew G.T. Martin (Attachments: #1 return receipts)(TARPEY, CAROLINE)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, LAURA ZUCHOWSKI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, #2 Summons issued to Laura Zuchowski, #3 Summons issued to U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons issued to U.S. Attorney) (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN W. ROCKERS on behalf of Plaintiff ROSA VERONICA RODRIGUEZ PEREZ (ROCKERS, JOHN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, LAURA ZUCHOWSKI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2589432.), filed by ROSA VERONICA RODRIGUEZ PEREZ.(TARPEY, CAROLINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODRIGUEZ PEREZ v. MCALEENAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA ZUCHOWSKI
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA VERONICA RODRIGUEZ PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN W. ROCKERS
Represented By: CAROLINE J. TARPEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?