RICON CONSTRUCTION, LLC. v. WATSON ENTERPRISES INTERNATIONAL, LLC.
Plaintiff: RICON CONSTRUCTION, LLC.
Defendant: WATSON ENTERPRISES INTERNATIONAL, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00597
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
2 Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Set Answer Deadline: WATSON ENTERPRISES INTERNATIONAL, LLC. answer due 8/19/2019. (Taylor, Abby)
July 23, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by WATSON ENTERPRISES INTERNATIONAL, LLC. For good cause shown, Defendant shall have up to and including August 19, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/23/2019.(Lee, Pedra)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Stacey Bailey Pharr filed by Plaintiff RICON CONSTRUCTION, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(PHARR, STEVE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff RICON CONSTRUCTION, LLC. by RICON CONSTRUCTION, LLC..(PHARR, STEVE)
July 11, 2019 Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER RE: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (Engle, Anita)
July 11, 2019 Case Reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by WATSON ENTERPRISES INTERNATIONAL, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (JAMES, RANDOLPH)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RANDOLPH M. JAMES on behalf of Defendant WATSON ENTERPRISES INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (JAMES, RANDOLPH)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to WATSON ENTERPRISES INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing Fee of $400.00 paid. Receipt number: 0418-2590054) against WATSON ENTERPRISES INTERNATIONAL, LLC., filed by RICON CONSTRUCTION, LLC..(PHARR, STEVE) Modified on 6/14/2019 to add receipt information. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICON CONSTRUCTION, LLC. v. WATSON ENTERPRISES INTERNATIONAL, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICON CONSTRUCTION, LLC.
Represented By: STEVE MACON PHARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON ENTERPRISES INTERNATIONAL, LLC.
Represented By: RANDOLPH M. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?