JOHNSON v. TURTLE CREEK ASSETS, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: JERRY JOHNSON
Defendant: GORDON ENGLE and TURTLE CREEK ASSETS, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00603
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by JERRY JOHNSON (HORMOZDI, SHIREEN)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by JERRY JOHNSON re #4 Notice of Settlement Withdrawing the Notice of Settlement (HORMOZDI, SHIREEN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement by JERRY JOHNSON (HORMOZDI, SHIREEN)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant GORDON ENGLE, TURTLE CREEK ASSETS, LTD., filed by JERRY JOHNSON.(HORMOZDI, SHIREEN)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
June 17, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GORDON ENGLE, TURTLE CREEK ASSETS, LTD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2591068.), filed by JERRY JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HORMOZDI, SHIREEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. TURTLE CREEK ASSETS, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GORDON ENGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURTLE CREEK ASSETS, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY JOHNSON
Represented By: SHIREEN HORMOZDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?