NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. OLSON

Plaintiff: NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: VICKI OLSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv00607
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (FAJEN, OLIVIA)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, by Plaintiff NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (FAJEN, OLIVIA)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for VICKI OLSON. Answer due by 7/22/2019. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on Defendant and subsequently file a certificate of service. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 7/8/2019. (Brubaker, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Defendant to File Answer by NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FAJEN, OLIVIA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY as to VICKI OLSON served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. Vicki Olson (FAJEN, OLIVIA)
June 18, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to VICKI OLSON. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 18, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NLV Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent National Life Holding Corporation for NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (FAJEN, OLIVIA)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VICKI OLSON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2591482.), filed by NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(FAJEN, OLIVIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICKI OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: OLIVIA F. FAJEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?