SHULMAN v. LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Plaintiff: Tatyana Shulman
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Case Number: 1:2019cv00616
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) transferring this action to the District of New Jersey. (Garland, Leah)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) re: MDL 2904 transferring this action to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of August 9, 2019. Received and filed on August 12, 2019. (Garland, Leah)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS. (BAYZLE, SCOTT)
July 19, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion for Stay of Proceedings. This matter is stayed in its entirety, including but not limited to (1) all scheduling deadlines pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules of this Court, (2) discovery, and (3) the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, pending a ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation concerning the transfer of this action for inclusion in MDL No. 2904 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s 1407. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 07/19/2019. (AULD, L.)
July 19, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond by 08/06/2019. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 07/19/2019. (AULD, L.)
July 16, 2019 Motions Referred re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #8 Consent MOTION to Stay, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Welch, Kelly)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS re #8 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS. (BAYZLE, SCOTT)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Stay by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS. Response to Motion due by 8/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAYZLE, SCOTT)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAYZLE, SCOTT)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON on behalf of Defendant LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS (LAWSON, CATHERINE)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SCOTT ELLIOTT BAYZLE on behalf of Defendant LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS (BAYZLE, SCOTT)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS. (BAYZLE, SCOTT)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 20, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2593313.), filed by Tatyana Shulman.(WILKERSON, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHULMAN v. LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatyana Shulman
Represented By: DAVID MATTHEW WILKERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: SCOTT ELLIOTT BAYZLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?