UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TILLEY, et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: THOMAS BRUCE TILLEY, MARSHA TILLEY, TT FARMS TRUST, R. NELSON RICHARDSON, COUNTY OF WAKE, NORTH CAROLINA, BRUCE TILLEY, THOMAS EARL TILLEY, GREEN ACRES TRUST, REALTY TRUST, TILLEY ENTERPRISES, IRIS TILLEY, CAROLYN CLEVELAND, STATE EMPLOYEES' CREDIT UNION, CACH, LLC, SIRI CAMP TRUST, LARRY RHINEHARDT, MBT TRUST, MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC, COUNTY OF DURHAM, NORTH CAROLINA, INVESTMENT TRUST, COUNTY OF GRANVILLE, NORTH CAROLINA, CITY OF DURHAM, NORTH CAROLINA, WASTE INDUSTRIES, LLC, VIRIGINIA MORTGAGE COMPANY, TILLEY SIX TRUST, TOWN OF BUTNER, NORTH CAROLINA and MELBA GEORGE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00626
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:3001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CITY OF DURHAM, NORTH CAROLINA. (ROSENTHAL, SHERRI)
July 22, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by COUNTY OF WAKE, NORTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ad valorem taxes)(ASKEW, ROGER)
July 22, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COUNTY OF WAKE, NORTH CAROLINA. (ASKEW, ROGER)
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROGER A. ASKEW on behalf of Defendant COUNTY OF WAKE, NORTH CAROLINA (ASKEW, ROGER)
July 22, 2019 Filing 28 Town of Butner - Answer ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TOWN OF BUTNER, NORTH CAROLINA. (WRENN, JAMES)
July 22, 2019 Filing 27 Granville County - Answer ANSWER to #1 Complaint by COUNTY OF GRANVILLE, NORTH CAROLINA. (WRENN, JAMES)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for THOMAS BRUCE TILLEY. Answer due by 8/23/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 7/19/2019. (Brubaker, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by THOMAS BRUCE TILLEY. (SATTERFIELD, DARON)
July 19, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to WASTE INDUSTRIES, LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 17, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by COUNTY OF DURHAM, NORTH CAROLINA. (WARDELL, BRYAN)
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by STATE EMPLOYEES' CREDIT UNION. (PLAUT, CATHLEEN)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant STATE EMPLOYEES' CREDIT UNION (PLAUT, CATHLEEN)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CATHLEEN M. PLAUT on behalf of Defendant STATE EMPLOYEES' CREDIT UNION (PLAUT, CATHLEEN)
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to LARRY RHINEHARDT served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to TOWN OF BUTNER, NORTH CAROLINA served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to CACH, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to COUNTY OF DURHAM, NORTH CAROLINA served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to R. NELSON RICHARDSON served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to COUNTY OF WAKE, NORTH CAROLINA served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to COUNTY OF GRANVILLE, NORTH CAROLINA served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to STATE EMPLOYEES' CREDIT UNION served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to CITY OF DURHAM, NORTH CAROLINA served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to VIRIGINIA MORTGAGE COMPANY served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to REALTY TRUST served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to MARSHA TILLEY served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to THOMAS BRUCE TILLEY served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mailed as to MBT TRUST served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to INVESTMENT TRUST served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to GREEN ACRES TRUST served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (STRUP, NATHAN)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 SECU, #2 Midland, #3 Cach, #4 Wake Co., #5 Town of Butner, #6 Granville Co., #7 Durham Co., #8 City of Durham, #9 C. Cleveland, #10 RNR, #11 M. George, #12 VA Mortgage, #13 TT Farms, #14 Tilley Six Trust, #15 Tilley Ent, #16 Siri, #17 Rinehardt, #18 Realty Trust, #19 Iris Tilley, #20 Marsha Tilley, #21 Bruce Tilley, #22 MBT, #23 Investment Trust, #24 Green Acres Trust, #25 TTilley)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 24, 2019 Case assigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Related Case # United States v. Tilley, 1:14-CR-00130-1), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - The 35 Real Properties)(STRUP, NATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TILLEY, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS BRUCE TILLEY
Represented By: DARON D. SATTERFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHA TILLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TT FARMS TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. NELSON RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF WAKE, NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: ROGER A. ASKEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE TILLEY
Represented By: DARON D. SATTERFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS EARL TILLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN ACRES TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REALTY TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TILLEY ENTERPRISES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRIS TILLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLYN CLEVELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE EMPLOYEES' CREDIT UNION
Represented By: CATHLEEN M. PLAUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CACH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIRI CAMP TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY RHINEHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBT TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF DURHAM, NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: BRYAN EDWARD WARDELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INVESTMENT TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF GRANVILLE, NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: JAMES CRYMES WRENN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF DURHAM, NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: SHERRI ZANN ROSENTHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASTE INDUSTRIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRIGINIA MORTGAGE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TILLEY SIX TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF BUTNER, NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: JAMES CRYMES WRENN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELBA GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: NATHAN L. STRUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?