CARPIO,ET AL. et al v. CUCCINELLI
Plaintiff: JEFERSON ANTONIO LANZA CARCAMO and ANTONIA AUDELINA CARPIO
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES and KEN CUCCINELLI
Case Number: 1:2019cv00639
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Plaintiffs ANTONIA AUDELINA CARPIO, JEFERSON ANTONIO LANZA CARCAMO re #9 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ANTONIA AUDELINA CARPIO, JEFERSON ANTONIO LANZA CARCAMO . (BANIAS, BRADLEY)
July 30, 2019 Electronic Notice on 7/30/2019 To/From Attorney Bradley Banias, Plaintiffs' counsel, indicating that #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is now moot based on the filing of #9 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. First motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #5 ) to be terminated. (Engle, Anita)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs ANTONIA AUDELINA CARPIO, JEFERSON ANTONIO LANZA CARCAMO re #9 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ANTONIA AUDELINA CARPIO, JEFERSON ANTONIO LANZA CARCAMO. (BANIAS, BRADLEY)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ANTONIA AUDELINA CARPIO, JEFERSON ANTONIO LANZA CARCAMO. Response to Motion due by 8/19/2019 (BANIAS, BRADLEY)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEVEN N. BAKER on behalf of Defendant KEN CUCCINELLI (BAKER, STEVEN)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTONIA AUDELINA CARPIO, JEFERSON ANTONIO LANZA CARCAMO. KEN CUCCINELLI served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. as to (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM In Support by Plaintiffs ANTONIA AUDELINA CARPIO, JEFERSON ANTONIO LANZA CARCAMO. (BANIAS, BRADLEY)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ANTONIA AUDELINA CARPIO, JEFERSON ANTONIO LANZA CARCAMO. Response to Motion due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KEN CUCCINELLI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 AUSA, #2 USAG)(Coyne, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THOMAS E. FULGHUM on behalf of Plaintiff ANTONIA AUDELINA CARPIO (FULGHUM, THOMAS)
June 27, 2019 Case assigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2598356.), filed by ANTONIA AUDELINA CARPIO, JEFERSON ANTONIO LANZA CARCAMO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARPIO,ET AL. et al v. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN CUCCINELLI
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFERSON ANTONIO LANZA CARCAMO
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: THOMAS E. FULGHUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIA AUDELINA CARPIO
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: THOMAS E. FULGHUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?