NANCE et al v. CITY OF ALBEMARLE, NORTH CAROLINA et al
Plaintiff: MRS. JENNIFER R. NANCE and MR. CHUCKY L. NANCE
Defendant: CITY OF ALBEMARLE, NORTH CAROLINA, MAYOR RONNIE MICHAEL, DIRECTOR KEVIN ROBINSON, CHIEF DANNY BOWEN and SA MEREDITH SHOAF
Case Number: 1:2019cv00641
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHUCKY L. NANCE, JENNIFER R. NANCE. DANNY BOWEN waiver sent on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (BOWLING, KIRK)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHUCKY L. NANCE, JENNIFER R. NANCE. CITY OF ALBEMARLE, NORTH CAROLINA waiver sent on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (BOWLING, KIRK)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHUCKY L. NANCE, JENNIFER R. NANCE. KEVIN ROBINSON waiver sent on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (BOWLING, KIRK)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHUCKY L. NANCE, JENNIFER R. NANCE. RONNIE MICHAEL waiver sent on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (BOWLING, KIRK)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MEREDITH A. FITZGIBBON on behalf of Defendants DANNY BOWEN, CITY OF ALBEMARLE, NORTH CAROLINA, RONNIE MICHAEL, KEVIN ROBINSON (FITZGIBBON, MEREDITH)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARSHA J. LYONS on behalf of Defendants DANNY BOWEN, CITY OF ALBEMARLE, NORTH CAROLINA, RONNIE MICHAEL, KEVIN ROBINSON (LYONS, MARSHA)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TAMMERA S. HILL on behalf of Defendant MEREDITH SHOAF (HILL, TAMMERA)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MEREDITH SHOAF. MEREDITH SHOAF waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (HILL, TAMMERA)
June 27, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2598738.), filed by CHUCKY L. NANCE, JENNIFER R. NANCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BOWLING, KIRK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NANCE et al v. CITY OF ALBEMARLE, NORTH CAROLINA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRS. JENNIFER R. NANCE
Represented By: KIRK LONDON BOWLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MR. CHUCKY L. NANCE
Represented By: KIRK LONDON BOWLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ALBEMARLE, NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: MARSHA J. LYONS
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYOR RONNIE MICHAEL
Represented By: MARSHA J. LYONS
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTOR KEVIN ROBINSON
Represented By: MARSHA J. LYONS
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF DANNY BOWEN
Represented By: MARSHA J. LYONS
Represented By: MEREDITH FITZGIBBON HAMILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA MEREDITH SHOAF
Represented By: TAMMERA S. HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?