JAMES v. AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Carlton Wilson James
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00643
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Williamson, Wanda)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC. for AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (POCOCK, DONALD)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019., WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (POCOCK, DONALD)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DONALD R. POCOCK on behalf of Defendant AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (POCOCK, DONALD)
June 28, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 28, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Other Causes of Action against American General Life Insurance Company, filed by Carlton Wilson James. (Filing Fee of $400.00 paid. Receipt number: 0418-2598970) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JOHNS, A.) Modified on 6/28/2019 to add in payment information. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMES v. AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Wilson James
Represented By: A. FRANK JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: DONALD R. POCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?