THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY v. BONITZ, INC. et al
Plaintiff: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: BONITZ, INC. and BONITZ FLOORING GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00658
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to All Defendants. Answer due 08/01/2019. (DEVORE, F.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (DEVORE, F.) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/15/2019) (Sheets, Jamie).
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BONITZ, INC., BONITZ FLOORING GROUP, INC. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2601901.), filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY.(DEVORE, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY v. BONITZ, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONITZ, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONITZ FLOORING GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: F. WILLIAM DEVORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?