ABDELMALEK v. DUKE UNIVERSITY
Plaintiff: MANAL ABDELMALEK and CHRISTOPHER KIGONGO
Defendant: DUKE UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00664
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Production of Documents) filed by MANAL ABDELMALEK filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY. Replies due by 6/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4.2.2020 letter to Fisher and Dubbeling, #2 Exhibit 2-download log)(CALABRO, REGINA)
May 27, 2020 Filing 40 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by DUKE UNIVERSITY. (CALABRO, REGINA)
May 20, 2020 Filing 39 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT (Corrected) against defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY, filed by MANAL ABDELMALEK.(FISHER, STEWART)
May 15, 2020 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff MANAL ABDELMALEK re #37 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Production of Documents) filed by MANAL ABDELMALEK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Objections and Responses, #2 Exhibit Letter dated 04/08/2020, #3 Exhibit Letter dated 04/22/2020)(DUBBELING, PAUL)
May 15, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Production of Documents) by MANAL ABDELMALEK. Response to Motion due by 5/29/2020 (DUBBELING, PAUL)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 5/14/2020. The parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is granted. The deadline for Plaintiff Abdelmalek to identify expert witnesses and produce expert reports is extended until August 15, 2020. The deadline for Defendant Duke to identify expert witnesses and produce expert reports is extended until September 15, 2020. The deadline for completion of all discovery is extended until October 15, 2020. (Daniel, J)
May 12, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sanders, Marlene)
May 11, 2020 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by MANAL ABDELMALEK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FISHER, STEWART)
April 21, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to #33 Second Amended Complaint by DUKE UNIVERSITY. (CALABRO, REGINA)
April 1, 2020 Filing 33 FILED IN ERROR*** Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY, filed by MANAL ABDELMALEK.(FISHER, STEWART) Modified on 5/19/2020 to mark filed in error - attorney to re-file. (Sheets, Jamie)
April 1, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting #32 Consent Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file the proposed Second Amended Complaint (in the form of the attachment to #32 Consent Motion) by 04/08/2020. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond by 04/22/2020. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 04/01/2020. (AULD, L.)
March 25, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #32 Consent MOTION to Amend #15 Amended Complaint to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sanders, Marlene)
March 25, 2020 Filing 32 Consent MOTION to Amend #15 Amended Complaint by MANAL ABDELMALEK. Response to Motion due by 4/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(FISHER, STEWART)
March 5, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #28 MOTION for Protective Order to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sanders, Marlene)
March 4, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY, filed by Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY, to Response to #28 MOTION for Protective Order filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY. (RIGGINS, ALYSSA)
February 26, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff MANAL ABDELMALEK re #28 MOTION for Protective Order filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY filed by MANAL ABDELMALEK. Replies due by 3/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Correspondence Between Counsel, #3 Exhibit Confidentiality Order in Kigongo Arbitration, #4 Exhibit Arbitration Management Conference Order)(FISHER, STEWART)
February 25, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by ERIC L. DOGGETT (DOGGETT, ERIC)
February 12, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Protective Order by DUKE UNIVERSITY. Response to Motion due by 2/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Protective Order)(CALABRO, REGINA)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Appointing ASA BELL as the mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl)
December 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PAUL MOORE DUBBELING on behalf of Plaintiff MANAL ABDELMALEK (DUBBELING, PAUL)
December 6, 2019 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Selection of Mediator due by 12/27/2019. Mediation due by 9/1/2020. (Gammon, Cheryl)
November 27, 2019 Set Scheduling Order Deadlines. The parties agree the appropriate case-management track for this case designated in L.R. 26.1(a) is Complex. Discovery due by 9/10/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/29/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2020. Dispositive motions due within 30 days from the close of discovery. Mediation due by 9/1/2020. The parties do not consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge. (Daniel, J)
November 26, 2019 TEXT ORDER (A) terminating #25 Plaintiff Manal Abdelmalek's Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan; and (B) adopting #24 Defendant's Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan, with the following modifications (for the reasons explained on the record at the Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/25/2019): (1) each party may take up to 10 depositions of fact witnesses, as well as depositions of any expert witnesses identified by the opposing party; and (2) the deadlines in Paragraph 10(a) apply to any expert disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2)(C), as well as to disclosures of reports from retained experts under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2)(B). Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/26/2019. (AULD, L.)
November 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/25/2019. The Court adopts the discovery schedule as agreed upon by the parties with modifications; Discovery Ends 9/10/2020; Text Order Forthcoming. (Attorney Stewart Fisher appeared on behalf of plaintiff MANAL ABDELMALEK; Attorney Regina Calabro appeared on behalf of defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY; Proceedings Recorded) (Kemp, Donita)
November 19, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #24 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual), #25 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual), to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
November 15, 2019 Filing 25 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). Response to Motion due by 12/6/2019 by MANAL ABDELMALEK.(FISHER, STEWART)
November 15, 2019 Filing 24 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). Response to Motion due by 12/6/2019 by DUKE UNIVERSITY.(CALABRO, REGINA)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 10/15/2019. The Joint Motion (Doc. #21 ) is GRANTED and the claims of Christopher Kigongo in this action are stayed pending completion of arbitration. In the absence of a motion by any party, Mr. Kigongo's claims will be dismissed on October 30, 2020. (Daniel, J)
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by DUKE UNIVERSITY. (CALABRO, REGINA)
October 15, 2019 Motions Submitted: #21 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings as to Only Christopher Kigongo Pending Arbitration to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
October 14, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings as to Only Christopher Kigongo Pending Arbitration by DUKE UNIVERSITY. Response to Motion due by 11/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Candidate Certification, #2 Exhibit Duke's DRP, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CALABRO, REGINA)
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Rescheduling: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 11/25/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
October 3, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Consent Motion to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference. The Clerk shall re-notice the Initial Pretrial Conference for 11/25/2019, with deadlines re-set accordingly for the meeting of the parties and filing of reports under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1(b). Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/03/2019. (AULD, L.)
October 2, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #19 Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Sanders, Marlene)
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference by MANAL ABDELMALEK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FISHER, STEWART)
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHRISTOPHER KIGONGO. (DOGGETT, ERIC)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ERIC L. DOGGETT on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER KIGONGO (DOGGETT, ERIC)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MANAL ABDELMALEK re #15 Amended Complaint (FISHER, STEWART)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by MANAL ABDELMALEK.(FISHER, STEWART)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 10/28/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by DUKE UNIVERSITY. (CALABRO, REGINA)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for DUKE UNIVERSITY. Answer due by 9/13/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/27/2019. (Brubaker, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MANAL ABDELMALEK as to All Defendants. on service by sheriff (FISHER, STEWART)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by DUKE UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Consent Motion for EOT for Def. to Answer)(RIGGINS, ALYSSA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY (RIGGINS, ALYSSA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ALYSSA M. RIGGINS on behalf of Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY (RIGGINS, ALYSSA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT A. SAR on behalf of Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY (SAR, ROBERT)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney REGINA W. CALABRO on behalf of Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY (CALABRO, REGINA)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Williamson, Wanda)
July 5, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DUKE UNIVERSITY. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 5, 2019 Case Assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MANAL ABDELMALEK. (FISHER, STEWART)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEWART W. FISHER on behalf of Plaintiff MANAL ABDELMALEK (FISHER, STEWART)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUKE UNIVERSITY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2603344), filed by MANAL ABDELMALEK. (FISHER, STEWART)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABDELMALEK v. DUKE UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANAL ABDELMALEK
Represented By: STEWART W. FISHER
Represented By: PAUL MOORE DUBBELING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER KIGONGO
Represented By: ERIC L. DOGGETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUKE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: ALYSSA M. RIGGINS
Represented By: REGINA W. CALABRO
Represented By: ROBERT A. SAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?