GREEN,et al v. SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mohageny Johnson, Maranda Knight, Tanika Arrington, Sumetra Hardy, Robert Caldwell, Stephon Carter, Dozine Rooks, Brandi Easter, Amelia Green, Nikia Scott, Keith Maryland, Jalesya Lofton, Latonia Boyd, James Farland, Maria Brockman, Keosha Graham, Constance Hood, Tanya Cole, Jeffrey Caldwell, Cameron Moody, Shariea Butler, Ronnie Wiggins, Marcus Thompson, Yolanda Thompson, Demetrius Bellamy, Frances Bennett and April Langley
Defendant: LoanMax, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC and Anderson Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00670
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT by TANIKA ARRINGTON, DEMETRIUS BELLAMY, FRANCES BENNETT, LATONIA BOYD, MARIA BROCKMAN, SHARIEA BUTLER, JEFFREY CALDWELL, ROBERT CALDWELL, STEPHON CARTER, TANYA COLE, BRANDI EASTER, JAMES FARLAND, KEOSHA GRAHAM, AMELIA GREEN, SUMETRA HARDY, CONSTANCE HOOD, MOHAGENY JOHNSON, MARANDA KNIGHT, APRIL LANGLEY, JALESYA LOFTON, KEITH MARYLAND, CAMERON MOODY, DOZINE ROOKS, NIKIA SCOTT, MARCUS THOMPSON, YOLANDA THOMPSON, RONNIE WIGGINS. (FAUCHER, JAMES)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. Deadlines are suspended until August 30, 2019, at which time the parties shall report to the Court. The Court does not anticipate additional delays, and the pretrial conference set for September 19, 2019, shall take place as scheduled. (Sanders, Marlene)
August 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED RE: #17 Status Report to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (Sanders, Marlene)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT by ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, LOANMAX, LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 9/19/2019 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint Counterclaim by TANIKA ARRINGTON, DEMETRIUS BELLAMY, FRANCES BENNETT, LATONIA BOYD, MARIA BROCKMAN, SHARIEA BUTLER, JEFFREY CALDWELL, ROBERT CALDWELL, STEPHON CARTER, TANYA COLE, BRANDI EASTER, JAMES FARLAND, KEOSHA GRAHAM, AMELIA GREEN, SUMETRA HARDY, CONSTANCE HOOD, MOHAGENY JOHNSON, MARANDA KNIGHT, APRIL LANGLEY, JALESYA LOFTON, KEITH MARYLAND, CAMERON MOODY, DOZINE ROOKS, NIKIA SCOTT, MARCUS THOMPSON, YOLANDA THOMPSON, RONNIE WIGGINS. (FAUCHER, JAMES)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #10 Complaint, , Counterclaim against by NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, LOANMAX, LLC, ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC, LOANSMART, LLC. (LAWSON, CATHERINE)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
July 9, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, LOANMAX, LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC.(Original documents issued in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS6017 on June 3, 2019 and are listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JEFFREY CALDWELL, RONNIE WIGGINS, DOZINE ROOKS, TANYA COLE, MARCUS THOMPSON, APRIL LANGLEY, SHARIEA BUTLER, AMELIA GREEN, MOHAGENY JOHNSON, MARANDA KNIGHT, KEOSHA GRAHAM, STEPHON CARTER, YOLANDA THOMPSON, TANIKA ARRINGTON, DEMETRIUS BELLAMY, BRANDI EASTER, JALESYA LOFTON, KEITH MARYLAND, LATONIA BOYD, MARIA BROCKMAN, ROBERT CALDWELL, FRANCES BENNETT, CAMERON MOODY, SUMETRA HARDY, NIKIA SCOTT, JAMES FARLAND, CONSTANCE HOOD. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS6017 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD on behalf of Defendants Anderson Financial Services, LLC, LoanMax, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC (ARROWOOD, CATHARINE)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON on behalf of Defendants Anderson Financial Services, LLC, LoanMax, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC (LAWSON, CATHERINE)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MELANIE BLACK DUBIS on behalf of Defendants Anderson Financial Services, LLC, LoanMax, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Management Resources, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Title Loans, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LoanSmart, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LoanMax, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anderson Financial Services, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2605320.)(Related Case # 1:19-cv-321, 1:19-cv-325, 1:19-cv-519, 1:19-cv-575), filed by North American Title Loans, LLC, LoanMax, LLC, Anderson Financial Services, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and Summonses, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Kenneth R. Wayco)(DUBIS, MELANIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN,et al v. SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanMax, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Loans, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanSmart, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Management Resources, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: CATHARINE B. ARROWOOD
Represented By: MELANIE BLACK DUBIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohageny Johnson
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maranda Knight
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanika Arrington
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sumetra Hardy
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Caldwell
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephon Carter
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dozine Rooks
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Easter
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Green
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikia Scott
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Maryland
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jalesya Lofton
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonia Boyd
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Farland
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Brockman
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keosha Graham
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Hood
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Cole
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Caldwell
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Moody
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shariea Butler
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Wiggins
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Thompson
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Thompson
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Bellamy
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Bennett
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Langley
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?