POMPEY v. C.P. BUCKNER STEEL ERECTION, INC.
Plaintiff: SHOHN POMPEY
Defendant: C.P. BUCKNER STEEL ERECTION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00676
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 09/05/2019, that the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report [Doc. #10 ] is approved as submitted and as noted herein. Discovery shall be established as Complex. Mediation should be conducted midway in the discovery period, the exact date to be set by the mediator after consultation with the parties. The parties have discussed special procedures for managing of the case and no agreement was reached. Trial of this action is expected to take approximately four days. A jury trial has been demanded. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2019. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2019. Discovery due by 3/5/2020. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 12/5/2019. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 12/5/2019. (Garland, Leah)
July 31, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #10 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by SHOHN POMPEY.(WRIGHT, R.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 8/15/2019 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
July 11, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to C.P. BUCKNER STEEL ERECTION, INC. (Original document issued in Guilford County Superior Court on 06/05/2019, Case Number 19CVS6093 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against C.P. BUCKNER STEEL ERECTION, INC., filed by SHOHN POMPEY. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS6093 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by C.P. BUCKNER STEEL ERECTION, INC.. (STILL, KYLE)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.P. BUCKNER STEEL ERECTION, INC.. (STILL, KYLE)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THOMAS C. STAFFORD on behalf of Defendant C.P. BUCKNER STEEL ERECTION, INC. (STAFFORD, THOMAS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KYLE R. STILL on behalf of Defendant C.P. Buckner Steel Erection, Inc. (STILL, KYLE)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against SHOHN POMPEY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2606963.), filed by C.P. Buckner Steel Erection, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(STILL, KYLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POMPEY v. C.P. BUCKNER STEEL ERECTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.P. BUCKNER STEEL ERECTION, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. STAFFORD
Represented By: KYLE R. STILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHOHN POMPEY
Represented By: RICHARD TOD GRANOWSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?