DELOATCH v. LOU POINT, L.L.C., et al.
Plaintiff: RANELLE DELOATCH
Defendant: LOU POINT, L.L.C. and RUTH'S HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00677
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, and Defenses by LOU POINT, L.L.C.. (ANDERSON, ZEBULON)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID A. PASLEY on behalf of Defendant LOU POINT, L.L.C. (PASLEY, DAVID)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSEPH E. HJELT on behalf of Plaintiff RANELLE DELOATCH (HJELT, JOSEPH)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for LOU POINT, L.L.C. Answer due by 8/16/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 07/11/2019. (Brubaker, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint, by LOU POINT, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ANDERSON, ZEBULON)
July 11, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 11, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LOU POINT, L.L.C., RUTH'S HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. (Original document issued in Durham County Superior Court in case number 19cvs2922 on 06/05/2019) (Coyne, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against LOU POINT, L.L.C., RUTH'S HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC., filed by RANELLE DELOATCH. (Original document filed in Durham County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS2922 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lou Point, L.L.C.. (ANDERSON, ZEBULON)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ZEBULON D. ANDERSON on behalf of Defendant Lou Point, L.L.C. (ANDERSON, ZEBULON)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Ranelle DeLoatch ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2606965.), filed by Lou Point, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ANDERSON, ZEBULON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELOATCH v. LOU POINT, L.L.C., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOU POINT, L.L.C.
Represented By: ZEBULON D. ANDERSON
Represented By: DAVID A. PASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUTH'S HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANELLE DELOATCH
Represented By: MICHAEL A. KORNBLUTH
Represented By: JOSEPH E. HJELT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?