UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $11,905.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $11,905.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00688
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE NON-PARTY on July 29, 2019 via regular mail with the Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice as to Richard W. Forrester, Attorney for Claimant, Anayeli Ortega (BAKER, STEVEN)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Served by publication in an official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) as to Legal Notice on date(s) July 17, 2019 through August 15, 2019. (BAKER, STEVEN)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 VERIFIED ANSWER to Forfeiture Complaint by $11,905.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY. (Taylor, Abby)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 USMS Return Executed for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice served on defendant property $11,905.00 in U.S. Currency on July 29, 2019, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (BAKER, STEVEN)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM, signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/15/2019. (Butler, Carol)
July 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 15, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Warrant for Arrest (), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAKER, STEVEN)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against CURRENCY, $11,905.00 IN U.S. (Filing fee.), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-1)(BAKER, STEVEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $11,905.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $11,905.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?