ALLEN v. WIRE, et al.
Plaintiff: DERRICK ALLEN
Defendant: CASEY HUMPHRIES, TED WIRE, WILL AUSTIN, ERIK MCCONCHIE and DAVE SIGUMUND
Case Number: 1:2019cv00689
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 10/9/2019 (Winchester, Robin)
August 21, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #9 First Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond by 09/18/2019. In #9 First Motion, counsel for Defendants represented as an officer of the Court that he "requires additional time to investigate the allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint and to prepare responsive filings." Plaintiff filed #11 Response opposing #9 First Motion, but did not offer any reason for the Court to doubt the representation made by counsel for Defendants in #9 First Motion or to deny the reasonable request in #9 First Motion; instead, #11 Response simply states that Plaintiff is "not in agreement with the extension of time requested by Defendant(s) [sic] counsel." Under these circumstances, the Court finds good cause under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(A) for the requested extension of time. The Court encourages Plaintiff to avoid the impulse to oppose any request made by Defendants simply because it comes from Defendants and to instead think critically about whether legitimate grounds exist to oppose a request. The Court expects Defendants to do the same in connection with any requests made by Plaintiff. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/21/2019. (AULD, L.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by CASEY HUMPHRIES, DAVE SIGUMUND, ERIK MCCONCHIE, TED WIRE, WILL AUSTIN, filed by DERRICK ALLEN. Replies due by 9/6/2019. (Butler, Carol)
August 20, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ASA C. EDWARDS, IV on behalf of Defendants WILL AUSTIN, CASEY HUMPHRIES, ERIK MCCONCHIE, DAVE SIGUMUND, TED WIRE (EDWARDS, ASA)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by WILL AUSTIN, CASEY HUMPHRIES, ERIK MCCONCHIE, DAVE SIGUMUND, TED WIRE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A: Proposed Order)(EDWARDS, ASA)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 USMS Return Executed for Complaint, Summons, NTC as to all Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Austin, #2 Sigmund, #3 Wire, #4 McConchie)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Plaintiff shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to WILL AUSTIN, CASEY HUMPHRIES, ERIK MCCONCHIE, DAVE SIGUMUND, TED WIRE. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld on 07/19/2019, that Plaintiff is permitted to commence said proceeding in this court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and complaint upon defendant. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 15, 2019 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld Re: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 15, 2019 Case REASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DERRICK ALLEN.(Coyne, Michelle)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by DERRICK ALLEN. (Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEN v. WIRE, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASEY HUMPHRIES
Represented By: ASA C. EDWARDS, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TED WIRE
Represented By: ASA C. EDWARDS, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILL AUSTIN
Represented By: ASA C. EDWARDS, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIK MCCONCHIE
Represented By: ASA C. EDWARDS, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE SIGUMUND
Represented By: ASA C. EDWARDS, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?