WHITFIELD v. COMENITY BANK
Plaintiff: DEVONA D. WHITFIELD
Defendant: COMENITY BANK
Case Number: 1:2019cv00697
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 08/05/2019, that: 1. The parties will advance any and all claims against one another in a binding arbitration proceeding as provided for in the governing arbitration provision. 2. This case is stayed until the resolution of the arbitration. 3. The parties shall report on the status of the arbitration and whether the issues are resolved such that dismissal is appropriate on a quarterly basis beginning October 1, 2019. (Garland, Leah)
August 2, 2019 Motion Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: #6 Consent MOTION to Stay Case and Compel Binding Arbitration. (Engle, Anita)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Stay Case and Compel Binding Arbitration by COMENITY BANK. Response to Motion due by 8/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Provision, #2 Exhibit Agreed Order)(WATSON, KRISTEN)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 8/26/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint (And Affirmative Defenses) by COMENITY BANK. (WATSON, KRISTEN)
July 16, 2019 Case assigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against COMENITY BANK, filed by DEVONA D. WHITFIELD. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS6312, attached as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMENITY BANK identifying Corporate Parent COMENITY LLC, Corporate Parent ADS ALLIANCE DATA SYSTEMS, INC., Corporate Parent ALLIANCE DATA SYSTEMS CORPORATION for COMENITY BANK.. (WATSON, KRISTEN)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against DEVONA D. WHITFIELD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2610850.), filed by COMENITY BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(WATSON, KRISTEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITFIELD v. COMENITY BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMENITY BANK
Represented By: KRISTEN P. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVONA D. WHITFIELD
Represented By: EDWARD H. MAGINNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?