LOCKETT V. SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, ET AL.
Plaintiff: MIKEENA LOCKETT ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF HOWARD HAIRSTON and MIKEENA LOCKETT
Defendant: SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC D/B/A BRIAN CENTER HEALTH & REHABILITATION/EDEN, ALISA BRADFORD and SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00706
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by Defendant ALISA BRADFORD, to Response to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment Rebuttal Memorandum in Support of Alisa Bradford's filed by ALISA BRADFORD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to P to send facility records)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants ALISA BRADFORD, SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings In Support of filed by ALISA BRADFORD, SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by ALISA BRADFORD, SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint filed 4.22.19, #2 Exhibit Dispute Resolution Program Agreement)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Law by MIKEENA LOCKETT. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2019 (ANGLIN, CHRISTOPHER)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE Memorandum filed by Plaintiff MIKEENA LOCKETT re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ALISA BRADFORD filed by MIKEENA LOCKETT. Replies due by 8/22/2019 (ANGLIN, CHRISTOPHER)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff MIKEENA LOCKETT (ANGLIN, CHRISTOPHER)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER JAMES ANGLIN on behalf of Plaintiff MIKEENA LOCKETT (ANGLIN, CHRISTOPHER)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Petition for Removal,, Exhibit 5 Certified State Court File by Defendant SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Corrected document re #8 Memorandum,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of A. Bradford)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
July 18, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALISA BRADFORD. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant ALISA BRADFORD re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment In Support of filed by ALISA BRADFORD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Bradford)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment by ALISA BRADFORD. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2019 (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
July 18, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand by SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ALISA BRADFORD, SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. (Original document issued in Rockingham County Superior Court Case Number 19CVS1158 on 04/22/2019 and is listed as Exhibit 4 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC by SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC.(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against ALISA BRADFORD, SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, filed by MIKEENA LOCKETT. (Original document filed in Rockingham County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS1158 and is listed as Exhibit 1 and 7 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by ALISA BRADFORD re #1 Petition for Removal,, Consent to and Joinder in Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Affidavit)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against MIKEENA LOCKETT ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF HOWARD HAIRSTON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2612316.), filed by SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC D/B/A BRIAN CENTER HEALTH & REHABILITATION/EDEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Affidavit of Sims, #3 Exhibit 3-Affidavit of Bradford, #4 Exhibit 4-Summons, #5 Exhibit 5-State Court File, #6 Exhibit 6- Summons Original Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7-Complaint 4.22.19, #8 Exhibit 8-Plaintiff's RFA, #9 Exhibit 9-Plaintiff's RFP, #10 Exhibit 10-Plaintiff's ROGs, #11 Exhibit 11-Subpoena)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOCKETT V. SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC D/B/A BRIAN CENTER HEALTH & REHABILITATION/EDEN
Represented By: MICHAEL E. PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALISA BRADFORD
Represented By: MICHAEL E. PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL E. PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKEENA LOCKETT ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF HOWARD HAIRSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKEENA LOCKETT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JAMES ANGLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?