FRIEDRICH v. USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK et al
Plaintiff: Andrew L. Friedrich
Defendant: USAA SAVINGS BANK and USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK
Case Number: 1:2019cv00720
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 10/23/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant USAA SAVINGS BANK by USAA SAVINGS BANK.(MEDLIN, LYNDSAY)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK by USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.(MEDLIN, LYNDSAY)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, USAA SAVINGS BANK. (MEDLIN, LYNDSAY)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK and USAA SAVINGS BANK. Answer due by 8/26/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 07/25/2019. (Brubaker, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, USAA SAVINGS BANK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint)(MEDLIN, LYNDSAY)
July 22, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, USAA SAVINGS BANK. (Original document issued in Cabarrus County Small Claims Court, Case Number 19CVM1845 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, USAA SAVINGS BANK, filed by ANDREW L. FRIEDRICH.(Original document filed in Cabarrus County Small Claims Court, Case Number 19CVM1845 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Andrew L. Friedrich ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2614130.), filed by USAA SAVINGS BANK, USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(MEDLIN, LYNDSAY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRIEDRICH v. USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA SAVINGS BANK
Represented By: LYNDSAY E. MEDLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK
Represented By: LYNDSAY E. MEDLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew L. Friedrich
Represented By: DOUGLAS STUART PUNGER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?