READ v. DREW AG TRANSPORT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: PATRICK FRANCIS READ
Defendant: TIMOTHY JAMES JACKSON and DREW AG TRANSPORT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00747
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #11 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by DREW AG TRANSPORT, INC..(BEVERLY, BRIAN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 9/19/2019 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by DREW AG TRANSPORT, INC. re #1 Petition for Removal, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal filed in state court (BEVERLY, BRIAN)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand by DREW AG TRANSPORT, INC.. (BEVERLY, BRIAN)
July 25, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 24, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney PATRICK T. WHITE. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 8/23/2019. (Garland, Leah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. (Garland, Leah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to DREW AG TRANSPORT, INC. (State Court document originally filed in Durham County Superior Court, case number 19CVS3219, issued 6/26/2019. Docketed as Attachment 2 to #1 Petition for Removal.) (Garland, Leah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against DREW AG TRANSPORT, INC., TIMOTHY JAMES JACKSON, filed by PATRICK FRANCIS READ. (State Court document originally filed in Durham County Superior Court, case number 19CVS3219, docketed as Attachment 3 to #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant DREW AG TRANSPORT, INC.. (BEVERLY, BRIAN)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRIAN ORLANDO BEVERLY on behalf of Defendant DREW AG TRANSPORT, INC. (BEVERLY, BRIAN)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Patrick Francis Read ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2616641.), filed by Timothy James Jackson, Drew AG Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 Exhibit state court summons, #3 Exhibit state court complaint)(BEVERLY, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: READ v. DREW AG TRANSPORT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY JAMES JACKSON
Represented By: BRIAN ORLANDO BEVERLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREW AG TRANSPORT, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN ORLANDO BEVERLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK FRANCIS READ
Represented By: PATRICK T. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?