FANT v. EARLY WARNING SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: LATONJA FANT
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, EARLY WARNING SERVICES, LLC and SUNTRUST BANK
Case Number: 1:2019cv00755
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION. Answer due by 9/20/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/29/2019. (Brubaker, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION.(CONNER, RICHARD)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CONNER, RICHARD)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for SUNTRUST BANK. Answer due by 9/30/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/27/2019. (Brubaker, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUNTRUST BANK identifying Corporate Parent SUNTRUST BANKS, INC., Corporate Parent SunTrust Bank Holdings Company for SUNTRUST BANK.. (RUDD, JAMIE)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMIE E. RUDD on behalf of Defendant SUNTRUST BANK (RUDD, JAMIE)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint by SUNTRUST BANK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RUDD, JAMIE)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LATONJA FANT as to BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (GWALTNEY, KARL)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LATONJA FANT as to SUNTRUST BANK served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (GWALTNEY, KARL)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LATONJA FANT as to EARLY WARNING SERVICES, LLC served on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (GWALTNEY, KARL)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for EARLY WARNING SERVICES, LLC. Answer due by 9/23/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/21/2019. (Brubaker, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney D. KYLE DEAK on behalf of Defendant EARLY WARNING SERVICES, LLC (DEAK, D.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint by EARLY WARNING SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DEAK, D.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Cosnent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, EARLY WARNING SERVICES, LLC, SUNTRUST BANK. (Attachments: #1 Early Warning, #2 Sun Trust)(Coyne, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
July 25, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff LATONJA FANT (GWALTNEY, KARL)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KARL S. GWALTNEY on behalf of Plaintiff LATONJA FANT (GWALTNEY, KARL)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2617568.), filed by LATONJA FANT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GWALTNEY, KARL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FANT v. EARLY WARNING SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD H. CONNER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EARLY WARNING SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: D. KYLE DEAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNTRUST BANK
Represented By: JAMIE E. RUDD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATONJA FANT
Represented By: KARL S. GWALTNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?