JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. PICKENS, et al
Plaintiff: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.
Defendant: Rosemary's Babe, LLC, Stanton Mercer Pickens and THE NORTHSIDE DISTRICT
Case Number: 1:2019cv00784
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID LOAR MCKENZIE on behalf of Defendants STANTON MERCER PICKENS, ROSEMARY'S BABE, LLC (MCKENZIE, DAVID)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to STANTON MERCER PICKENS served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (COKER, JOSE)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to ROSEMARY'S BABE, LLC served on 9/7/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (COKER, JOSE)
September 9, 2019 TEXT ORDER extending the deadline for Defendant Stanton Mercer Pickens to answer or otherwise respond to 09/28/2019. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 09/09/2019. (AULD, L.)
September 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED RE: #9 Notice (Other), to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for ROSEMARY'S BABE, LLC. Answer due by 9/28/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/30/2019. (Brubaker, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROSEMARY'S BABE, LLC. (OLIVE, SUSAN)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by ROSEMARY'S BABE, LLC re #1 Complaint, attaching Defendant Pickens' Motion for 30-day Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Motion by Stanton Pickens for 30-day extension of time, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(OLIVE, SUSAN)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, through and including Sept 28, 2019, by ROSEMARY'S BABE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(OLIVE, SUSAN)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN on behalf of Plaintiff JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bar Admission List for Julie Cohen Lonstein, Esq.)(LONSTEIN, JULIE)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to STANTON MERCER PICKENS, ROSEMARY'S BABE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Stanton)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 5, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 5, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (COKER, JOSE)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (COKER, JOSE)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2622404.), filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Advertisement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Summons for Pickens, #4 Civil Summons for Rosemary's)(COKER, JOSE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. PICKENS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary's Babe, LLC
Represented By: SUSAN FREYA OLIVE
Represented By: DAVID LOAR MCKENZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanton Mercer Pickens
Represented By: DAVID LOAR MCKENZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NORTHSIDE DISTRICT
Represented By: SUSAN FREYA OLIVE
Represented By: DAVID LOAR MCKENZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.
Represented By: JOSE A. COKER
Represented By: JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?