PATRICK v. USP MCCREARY
Petitioner: JOHN PATRICK
Respondent: USP MCCREARY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00790
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT as to JOHN PATRICK, signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 9/12/2019, adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation, that Petitioner's Letter, (Doc. #1 ), is construed as a Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241, and that this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Petitioner filing his claims on the proper forms in the proper district after exhausting his administrative remedies. (Butler, Carol)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER that in forma pauperis status is granted. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 8/20/2019. See #2 .(Butler, Carol)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2019. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 9/6/2019. (Butler, Carol)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION as to JOHN RICHARD PATRICK, JR., signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 4/20/2019. ORDERED that Petitioner's request for transcripts and copies is denied without prejudice as set out above and that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Petitioner filing his claims on the proper forms in the proper district after exhausting his administrative remedies. (Butler, Carol)
August 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED for Screening. (Garland, Leah)
August 6, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JOHN PATRICK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATRICK v. USP MCCREARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOHN PATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USP MCCREARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?