RODRIGUEZ v. BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: ASHLEY RODRIGUEZ
Defendant: BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00797
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/02/2019, that the Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #14 ] is GRANTED, and the time within which Plaintiff may respond to Defendant's Motion is extended up to and including October 15, 2019.(Taylor, Abby)
September 24, 2019 Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #12 Memorandum, #13 Corrected Document. (Engle, Anita)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 Memorandum, #13 Corrected Document by ASHLEY RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BEGNOCHE, SUZANNE)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 Corrected document re #12 Memorandum. (DARER, BRIAN)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (DARER, BRIAN)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. Response to Motion due by 9/24/2019 (DARER, BRIAN)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ERIC S. SILVESTRI on behalf of Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. (SILVESTRI, ERIC)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSEPH P. LOMBARDO on behalf of Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. (LOMBARDO, JOSEPH)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. Answer due by 9/3/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/07/2019. (Brubaker, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint by BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CLODFELTER, CATHERINE)
August 6, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. (Original document issued in Orange County Superior Court, Case Number 19cv812 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A., filed by ASHLEY RODRIGUEZ. (Original document filed in Orange County Superior Court, Case Number 19CV812 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CATHERINE G. CLODFELTER on behalf of Defendant BMO Harris Bank, N.A. (CLODFELTER, CATHERINE)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO Harris Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal, Toronto, Canada, Corporate Parent BMO Financial Group for BMO Harris Bank, N.A... (DARER, BRIAN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRIAN D. DARER on behalf of Defendant BMO Harris Bank, N.A. (DARER, BRIAN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Ashley Rodriguez ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2624839.)(Related Case # 1:19-cv-796), filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DARER, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODRIGUEZ v. BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.
Represented By: CATHERINE G. CLODFELTER
Represented By: BRIAN D. DARER
Represented By: JOSEPH P. LOMBARDO
Represented By: ERIC S. SILVESTRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: SUZANNE R. BEGNOCHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?