RUFFIN, v. HARTWICK, et al
Plaintiff: CURTIS LAMAR RUFFIN, JR.
Defendant: CARGO SOLUTIONS CO, INC., BAY SHIPPERS and WILLIAM BRIAN HARTWICK
Case Number: 1:2019cv00800
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice by CURTIS LAMAR RUFFIN, JR. (Butler, Carol)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for CARGO SOLUTIONS CO, INC. and WILLIAM BRIAN HARTWICK. Answer due by 10/12/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 9/12/2019. (Brubaker, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, by CARGO SOLUTIONS CO, INC., WILLIAM BRIAN HARTWICK. (ZEMP, FRANCIS)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by All Defendants. Answer due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 8/12/2019 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, by CARGO SOLUTIONS CO, INC., WILLIAM BRIAN HARTWICK. (ZEMP, FRANCIS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney FRANCIS LACHICOTTE ZEMP, JR on behalf of Defendants CARGO SOLUTIONS CO, INC., WILLIAM BRIAN HARTWICK (ZEMP, FRANCIS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 ECF 30 Day Notice as to Attorney Mark Gray, II. ECF 30 Day Notice due by 9/9/2019. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 7, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CARGO SOLUTIONS CO, INC., WILLIAM BRIAN HARTWICK. (Original documents issued in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS6873 on 07/02/2019 and are attached as exhibits 2&3 to the Petition for Removal) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CARGO SOLUTIONS CO, INC., WILLIAM BRIAN HARTWICK, filed by CURTIS LAMAR RUFFIN, JR. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS6873 and is listed as exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Curtis Lamar Ruffin, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2625112.), filed by Bay Shippers, LLC, Cargo Solutions Co., Inc., William Brian Hartwick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(GRANT, JACQUELINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUFFIN, v. HARTWICK, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARGO SOLUTIONS CO, INC.
Represented By: JACQUELINE D. GRANT
Represented By: FRANCIS LACHICOTTE ZEMP, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAY SHIPPERS
Represented By: JACQUELINE D. GRANT
Represented By: FRANCIS LACHICOTTE ZEMP, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BRIAN HARTWICK
Represented By: JACQUELINE D. GRANT
Represented By: FRANCIS LACHICOTTE ZEMP, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS LAMAR RUFFIN, JR.
Represented By: MARK VAN LANIER GRAY
Represented By: MARK GRAY, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?