MPE HOLDINGS, LLC v. DEPCOM POWER, INC.
Plaintiff: MPE HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: DEPCOM POWER, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00812
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff MPE HOLDINGS, LLC (CULP, HEATHER)
September 12, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE Consolidated Response and Reply filed by Defendant DEPCOM POWER, INC. re #12 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] filed by DEPCOM POWER, INC., #17 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Complaint [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] filed by MPE HOLDINGS, LLC filed by DEPCOM POWER, INC.. Replies due by 9/26/2019 (POWELL, BRENT)
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion to Seal filed by Plaintiff MPE HOLDINGS, LLC re #13 Brief, filed by DEPCOM POWER, INC. filed by MPE HOLDINGS, LLC. Replies due by 9/12/2019 (CULP, HEATHER)
August 29, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file any response to #9 Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by 09/26/2019. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/29/2019. (AULD, L.)
August 29, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file any response to #12 Motion to Seal by 09/26/2019. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/29/2019. (AULD, L.)
August 28, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #21 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file, #20 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration Unopposed Motion, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Williamson, Wanda)
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] Unopposed Motion by MPE HOLDINGS, LLC. (CULP, HEATHER)
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration Unopposed Motion by MPE HOLDINGS, LLC. (CULP, HEATHER)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration in Support of Motion to File Under Seal re #17 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Complaint [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4].. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(CULP, HEATHER)
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF re #17 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Complaint [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] . (CULP, HEATHER)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Complaint [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] by MPE HOLDINGS, LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/12/2019 (CULP, HEATHER)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DEPCOM POWER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Mediators)(MOHR, PHILIP)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT re #11 Declaration by Defendant DEPCOM POWER, INC., Plaintiff MPE HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(POWELL, BRENT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED BRIEF re #10 Brief by Defendant DEPCOM POWER, INC., Plaintiff MPE HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Unredacted Complaint)(POWELL, BRENT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF re #12 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] by Defendant DEPCOM POWER, INC. filed by DEPCOM POWER, INC.. (POWELL, BRENT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] by DEPCOM POWER, INC.. Response to Motion due by 9/5/2019 (POWELL, BRENT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION filed by Defendant DEPCOM POWER, INC. re #10 Brief (REDACTED) filed by DEPCOM POWER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal))(POWELL, BRENT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration (REDACTED) by Defendant DEPCOM POWER, INC. filed by DEPCOM POWER, INC.. (POWELL, BRENT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by DEPCOM POWER, INC.. Response to Motion due by 9/5/2019 (POWELL, BRENT)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRENT F. POWELL on behalf of Defendant DEPCOM POWER, INC. (POWELL, BRENT)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN T. SINK on behalf of Defendant DEPCOM POWER, INC. (SINK, JONATHAN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PHILIP J. MOHR on behalf of Defendant DEPCOM POWER, INC. (MOHR, PHILIP)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney HEATHER W. CULP on behalf of Plaintiff MPE HOLDINGS, LLC (CULP, HEATHER)
August 8, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 8, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DEPCOM POWER, INC. (Original document filed in Cabarrus County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS2340 and is listed as exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against DEPCOM POWER, INC., filed by MPE HOLDINGS, LLC. (Original document filed in Cabarrus County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS2340 and is listed as exhibit 2 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/9/2019 at the request of counsel who consented and stated that the complaint attached as exhibit 2 to the Petition for Removal was not the complaint filed in state court) (Coyne, Michelle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2626755.), filed by DEPCOM Power, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(MOHR, PHILIP) Attachment 2 replaced on 8/13/2019 Attachment 2 replaced on 8/13/2019 at the request of counsel who consented and stated that the complaint attached as exhibit 2 to the Petition for Removal was not the complaint filed in state court)(Coyne, Michelle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MPE HOLDINGS, LLC v. DEPCOM POWER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPCOM POWER, INC.
Represented By: PHILIP J. MOHR
Represented By: BRENT F. POWELL
Represented By: JONATHAN T. SINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MPE HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: HEATHER W. CULP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?