THOMAS v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: DONNETTE DAWN THOMAS
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00820
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. Answer due by 11/7/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/4/2019. (Brubaker, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC (DAILEY, COLIN)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DAILEY, COLIN) Modified on 10/4/2019. (Brubaker, John).
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garland, Leah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donnette Dawn Thomas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2628371.), filed by Donnette Dawn Thomas.(PERRY, MICHEAL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: COLIN D. W. DAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNETTE DAWN THOMAS
Represented By: MICHEAL SHANE PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?