SHEN v. CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff: COLETTE SHEN
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00830
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by COLETTE SHEN Memorandum Brief in Support of Response in Opposition filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Replies due by 10/25/2019 (CASH, RACHEL)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by COLETTE SHEN filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Replies due by 10/25/2019 (CASH, RACHEL)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff COLETTE SHEN re #8 Brief, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed by COLETTE SHEN. Replies due by 10/4/2019 (TANNER, JAMES)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by COLETTE SHEN. Response to Motion due by 10/11/2019 (TANNER, JAMES)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION identifying Corporate Parent CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (CASH, RACHEL) Modified on 9/3/2019 to remove unnecessary punctuation in docket text. (Butler, Carol)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cardholder Agreement)(CASH, RACHEL)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Response to Motion due by 9/20/2019 (CASH, RACHEL)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RACHEL B. CASH on behalf of Defendant CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (CASH, RACHEL)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Answer due by 8/30/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/20/2019. (Brubaker, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (LONG, WILLIAM)
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Original document issued in Orange County Superior Court, Case Number 19CV932 on 07/08/2019 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, filed by COLETTE SHEN. (Original document filed in Orange County Superior Court, Case Number 19CV932 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against COLETTE SHEN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2630405.), filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LONG, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHEN v. CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: WILLIAM J. LONG
Represented By: RACHEL B. CASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLETTE SHEN
Represented By: JAMES E. TANNER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?