UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BYNUM

Case Number: 1:2019cv00831
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-00144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to TRANSFER this case to the Middle District of North Carolina for further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 08/13/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/13/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Venue by United States of America. Responses due by 8/14/2019 (Wood, Julia) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/13/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Pro Se ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Milele Bynum.(brj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/13/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wood, Julia) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/13/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Milele Bynum served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (rys) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/13/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process. IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiff is granted an additional 90 days for service of the Summons and Complaint upon the defendant, through and including September 21, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/18/2019. (brl) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/13/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Wood, Julia) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/13/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Milele Bynum. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.1.1. (brl) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/13/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by the USM as to Milele Bynum. (brj) Modified text on 5/14/2019 (brl). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/13/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Milele Bynum. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/13/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/13/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Milele Bynum , filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wood, Julia) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BYNUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?