WILLIAMS v. TOUCH POINT STAFFING et al
Plaintiff: TANIESHA WILLIAMS
Defendant: TOUCH POINT STAFFING and FIRST POINT RESOURCES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00840
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 USMS Return Unexecuted as to Touch Point Staffing, Inc. (Butler, Carol)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FIRST POINT RESOURCES, TOUCH POINT STAFFING. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld on 08/19/2019, that Plaintiff Taneisha Williams is permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk the correct summons for service on each defendant. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and complaint upon defendant. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 16, 2019 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against FIRST POINT RESOURCES, TOUCH POINT STAFFING, filed by TANIESHA WILLIAMS.(Coyne, Michelle)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by TANIESHA WILLIAMS. (Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. TOUCH POINT STAFFING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOUCH POINT STAFFING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST POINT RESOURCES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANIESHA WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?