CRANK v. SAUL
Plaintiff: ANTONIA LENA CRANK
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00842
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTONIA LENA CRANK. ANDREW M. SAUL served on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. as to Commissioner of Social Security (BOWLING, RUSSELL)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent - SSA. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 SSA, #2 USAG)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster on 08/20/2019, that Plaintiff is permitted to commence said proceeding in this court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 19, 2019 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster RE: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 19, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by ANTONIA LENA CRANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action)(BOWLING, RUSSELL)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by ANTONIA LENA CRANK. (BOWLING, RUSSELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRANK v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIA LENA CRANK
Represented By: RUSSELL R. BOWLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?