FLEET FEET INCORPORATED v. NIKE INC. et al
Plaintiff: Fleet Feet Incorporated
Defendant: Nike Retail Services, Inc., Nike USA, Inc. and NIKE INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00885
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Fleet Feet's Answer and Defenses to Nike's Counterclaims by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (ANDERSON, CORBY)
October 28, 2019 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Timothy L. Capria filed by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Defendant FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED re #44 SEALED Reply to Response to Motion, #45 Redacted Document filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EVERYTHING CHANGES Dead Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - SPEED CHANGES EVERYTHING Cancellation, #3 Exhibit 3 - USPTO Office Action for Serial No. 88,508,382, #4 Exhibit 4 - USPTO Office Action for Serial No. 88,508,382, #5 Exhibit 5 - Prosecution History for Serial No. 88,600,649, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Publication for Serial No. 88,508,382, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Publication for Serial No. 88,571,097, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Publication for Serial No. 88,600,649, #9 Exhibit 9 - U.S. Reg. No. 8,832,391, #10 Exhibit 10 - Prosecution History for Serial No. 88,570,136, #11 Exhibit 11 - Cancellation No. 92072504, #12 Exhibit 12 - Motion to Amend Registration)(ANDERSON, CORBY)
October 28, 2019 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Joey Pointer filed by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Defendant FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED re #44 SEALED Reply to Response to Motion, #45 Redacted Document filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Product Comparison, #2 Exhibit 2 - Instagram Posts)(ANDERSON, CORBY)
October 28, 2019 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Brent Hollowell filed by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Defendant FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED re #44 SEALED Reply to Response to Motion, #45 Redacted Document filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Uses of RUNNING CHANGES EVERYTHING and CHANGE EVERYTHING Alone, #2 Exhibit 2 - Appendix of More Nike SPORT CHANGES EVERYTHING Videos, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demery Video, #4 Exhibit 4 - Appendix of Nike JUST DO IT Videos, #5 Exhibit 5 - Comparison of JUST DO IT to SPORT CHANGES EVERYTHING, #6 Exhibit 6 - Nike Employee wearing SPORT CHANGES EVERYTHING shirt, #7 Exhibit 7 - Instagram Post with SPORT CHANGES EVERYTHING Signage, #8 Exhibit 8 - Nike SPORT CHANGES EVERYTHING Article, #9 Exhibit 9 - Nike uses of SPORT CHANGES EVERYTHING with Running on Social Media)(ANDERSON, CORBY)
October 28, 2019 Filing 45 REDACTION to #44 SEALED Reply to Response to Motion, for Preliminary Injunction by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Updated Trademark Chart)(ANDERSON, CORBY)
October 28, 2019 Filing 44 SEALED REPLY, filed by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Defendant FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Claimants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., to Response to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Updated Trademark Chart)(ANDERSON, CORBY)
October 25, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (ANDERSON, CORBY)
October 25, 2019 Filing 42 SEALED UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS Exhibits to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal filed by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Defendant FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Claimants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC. re #40 SEALED Brief. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Unredacted Gravatt Declaration, #2 Sealed Unredacted Miller Declaration)(MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 25, 2019 Filing 41 Corrected Document SEALED BRIEF re: #40 SEALED Brief by Counter Claimants NIKE USA, INC., NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., Defendants NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., NIKE INC., Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Defendant FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 24, 2019 Filing 40 SEALED BRIEF re #39 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] by Counter Claimants NIKE USA, INC., NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., Defendants NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., NIKE INC., Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Defendant FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Sealed Unredacted Miller Declaration, #3 Sealed Unredacted Gravatt Declaration)(MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 24, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] by NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC.. Response to Motion due by 11/14/2019 (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 18, 2019 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Tamar Duvdevani by Counter Claimants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- screenshot, #2 Exhibit 2-screenshot, #3 Exhibit 3- screenshot, #4 Exhibit 4- screenshot, #5 Exhibit 5- screenshot, #6 Exhibit 6- screenshot, #7 Exhibit 7- screenshot, #8 Exhibit 8- screenshot, #9 Exhibit 9- screenshot, #10 Exhibit 10- screenshot, #11 Exhibit 11- screenshot, #12 Exhibit 12- screenshot, #13 Exhibit 13- screenshot, #14 Exhibit 14- screenshot, #15 Exhibit 15- screenshot, #16 Exhibit 16- screenshot, #17 Exhibit 17- report, #18 Exhibit 18- screenshot, #19 Exhibit 19- screenshot, #20 Exhibit 20- screenshot, #21 Exhibit 21- screenshot, #22 Exhibit 22- Petition to Cancel, #23 Exhibit 23- Petition to Cancel)(MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 18, 2019 Filing 37 REDACTED DECLARATION of David Frank by Counter Claimants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- images, #2 Exhibit B- image)(MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 18, 2019 Filing 36 REDACTED DECLARATION of Scott Gravatt by Counter Claimants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC.. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 18, 2019 Filing 35 REDACTED DECLARATION Natalie Miller by Counter Claimants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Screenshots, #2 Exhibit B- Images, #3 Exhibit C- Website, #4 Exhibit D- Website)(MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 18, 2019 Filing 34 REDACTED RESPONSE in Opposition re: #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED filed by NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC. Replies due by 10/25/2019 (MATTHEWS, RICHARD) Modified docket text on 10/18/2019 to reflect "redacted" document. (Daniel, J)
October 18, 2019 Filing 33 SEALED DOCUMENT of Scott Gravatt Declaration of Scott Gravatt by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Defendant FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Claimants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC.. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 18, 2019 Filing 32 SEALED DOCUMENT of David Frank Declaration of David Frank by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Defendant FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Claimants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B- image)(MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 18, 2019 Filing 31 SEALED DOCUMENT of Natalie Miller Declaration of Natalie Miller by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Defendant FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Claimants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC.. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 18, 2019 Filing 30 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Counter Claimants NIKE USA, INC., NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., Defendants NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., NIKE INC., Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED, Counter Defendant FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED filed by NIKE USA, INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE INC., FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. Replies due by 10/25/2019 (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 10/17/2019. The defendants are authorized to file the unredacted brief in opposition and any unredacted exhibits containing allegedly confidential information under temporary seal as set out herein. The plaintiff's reply brief and any exhibits shall be served but not filed on October 25, 2019, 14 days from the date the brief in opposition was served. The plaintiff shall file a certificate of service. With the agreement of the parties, the defendants shall file one motion to seal directed towards the brief in opposition, the reply brief, and the exhibits, no later than October 24, 2019; any brief in opposition is due October 31, 2019; and any reply brief is due November 1, 2019. Counsel shall reserve November 5, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. and November 12, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. for a hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction, should the Court determine one is needed. Defense counsel shall keep the case manager advised of developments in counsel's trial schedule the week of November 4. (Daniel, J)
October 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES: Telephone Conference held on 10/17/19 regarding process for Motions to Seal. Attorneys Matthew DeAntonio, William Cherry, III and Corby Anderson present as counsel for plaintiff. Attorneys Richard Matthews and Tamar Duvdevani present as counsel for defendants. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Joe Armstrong.) (Sanders, Marlene)
October 14, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW R. SHORES on behalf of Counter Claimants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC. (SHORES, ANDREW)
October 12, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM SUTTON CHERRY, III on behalf of Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED (CHERRY, WILLIAM)
October 11, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC. Regarding NIKE's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., Counter Claimant NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Counter Claimant NIKE USA, INC., Defendant NIKE USA, INC.. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Counter Claimant NIKE INC., Defendant NIKE INC.. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Counterclaim against by NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., NIKE INC.. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES: Defendants have made a last minute request for a conference with the court re: filing materials under seal in opposition to the motion for preliminary injunction. In lieu of filing a redacted brief and exhibits and a motion to seal tomorrow, Defendants shall serve the unredacted brief and attachments along with a redacted brief and attachments, on plaintiff and shall file a certificate of service, pending further Court action; if the brief does not require redaction, it shall be filed. Plaintiffs counsel shall not disclose the information that is redacted, pending further order or agreement between the parties. Defendants shall consult with plaintiff and when the Courts schedule frees up, a conference will be scheduled. (Sanders, Marlene)
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TAMAR Y. DUVDEVANI on behalf of Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC. (DUVDEVANI, TAMAR)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MELISSA A. REINCKENS on behalf of Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC. (REINCKENS, MELISSA)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARC E. MILLER on behalf of Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC. (MILLER, MARC)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer First Amended Verified Complaint for All Defendants. Answer due by 10/11/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/2/2019. (Brubaker, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint, by NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RICHARD T. MATTHEWS on behalf of Defendants NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC. (MATTHEWS, RICHARD)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Delivery Receipts September 12, 2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - Delivery Receipts September 20, 2019)(DEANTONIO, MATTHEW)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 Brief In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - Nike 10K, #2 Exhibit 02 - Office Action)(DEANTONIO, MATTHEW)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 Brief In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (DEANTONIO, MATTHEW)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 Brief In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (DEANTONIO, MATTHEW)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 Brief In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - Signage NO BOUNDARIES program, #2 Exhibit 02 - Pages from NO BOUNDARIES program, #3 Exhibit 03 - CHANGE EVERYTHING store front signage)(DEANTONIO, MATTHEW)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 Brief In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - Charlotte Nike Factory Store, #2 Exhibit 02 - Concord Mills Nike Factory Store, #3 Exhibit 03 - Myrtle Beach Nike Factory Store, #4 Exhibit 04 - Smithfield Nike Factory Store)(DEANTONIO, MATTHEW)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - Fleet Feet Products, #2 Exhibit 02 - Fleet Feet Brands, #3 Exhibit 03 - Fleet Feet Training programs, #4 Exhibit 04 - Franchise Agreement Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 05 - Brand Standards and Style Guide, #6 Exhibit 06 - March 2009 Runner's World Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 07 - RUNNING CHANGES EVERYTHING Internet Ads, #8 Exhibit 08 - RUNNING CHANGES EVERYTHING Email Uses, #9 Exhibit 09 - RUNNING CHANGES EVERYTHING Apparel Uses, #10 Exhibit 10 - RUNNING CHANGES EVERYTHING Social Media Uses, #11 Exhibit 11 - RUNNING CHANGES EVERYTHING Outdoor Signage, #12 Exhibit 12 - CHANGE EVERYTHING Website Use, #13 Exhibit 13 - CHANGE EVERYTHING Promotional Items, #14 Exhibit 14 - Customers Referring to RUNNING CHANGES EVERYTHING on Social Media, #15 Exhibit 15 - Proximity Analysis 4845-3846-7750 v.3, #16 Exhibit 16 - Photos of Fleet Feet's Carrboro, NC Headquarters, #17 Exhibit 17 - 2018 Fleet Feet Marketing Calendar, #18 Exhibit 18 - 2019.08.13 - Letter from W. Cherry to J. Reynolds, #19 Exhibit 19 - Nike Mobile Site Homepage, #20 Exhibit 20 - Artwork comparison, #21 Exhibit 21 - Appendix of Nike Videos, #22 Exhibit 22 - Nike News Article, #23 Exhibit 23 - Nike Chicago Website, #24 Exhibit 24 - Nike Pop-Up Races Website, #25 Exhibit 25 - Quigley Instagram Post, #26 Exhibit 26 - 2009 Annual Report, #27 Exhibit 27 - 2019 Annual Conference Vendor Update, #28 Exhibit 28 - 2019 Annual Conference Nike Attendees, #29 Exhibit 29 - Fleet Feet Knoxville Website)(DEANTONIO, MATTHEW)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Trademark Chart)(ANDERSON, CORBY)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. Response to Motion due by 10/10/2019 (ANDERSON, CORBY)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC., filed by FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - Registration for 4,832,391, #2 Exhibit 02 - Registration for 4,833,944, #3 Exhibit 03 - Application for 88,570,136, #4 Exhibit 04 - Application for 88,508,382, #5 Exhibit 05 - Application for 88,571,097, #6 Exhibit 06 - Filing Receipt for Application for 88,600,649, #7 Exhibit 07 - Fleet Feet's Use of Mark in Franchise Sales, #8 Exhibit 08 - Fleet Feet's Use of Mark in Store Signage, #9 Exhibit 09 - Fleet Feet's Use of Mark on Apparel, #10 Exhibit 10 - Fleet Feet's Use of Mark in Email Newsletters, #11 Exhibit 11 - Fleet Feet's Use of Mark in Print, Online, and Social Media, #12 Exhibit 12 - Fleet Feet's Use of Mark in Promotional Materials, #13 Exhibit 13 - Nike Welcome Power Point, #14 Exhibit 14 - Vendor Partner Resource Guide, #15 Exhibit 15 - MLB All Star Game Commercial, #16 Exhibit 16 - Chicago Mural, #17 Exhibit 17 - 2019.087.22 - Scott Gravatt Email, #18 Exhibit 18 - 2019.08.07 Letter to Nike, #19 Exhibit 19 - Nike Website 2019.08.12, #20 Exhibit 20 - Nike Website 2019.08.29, #21 Exhibit 21 - Nike infringement in Mebane, NC, #22 Exhibit 22 - Nike Infringement in Chicago, IL)(DEANTONIO, MATTHEW)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MATTHEW S. DEANTONIO on behalf of Plaintiff FLEET FEET, INCORPORATED (DEANTONIO, MATTHEW)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NIKE INC., NIKE RETAIL SERVICES, INC., NIKE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Nike Inc., #2 Nike USA)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
September 3, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 3, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fleet Feet Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Fleet Feet Sports, LLC, Corporate Parent Investors Management Corporation for Fleet Feet Incorporated. (ANDERSON, CORBY)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2644714.), filed by Fleet Feet Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration No. 4,832,391, #2 Exhibit 2 - Registration No. 8,833,944, #3 Exhibit 3 - Application Serial No. 88,570,136, #4 Exhibit 4 - Application Serial No. 88,508,382, #5 Exhibit 5 - Application Serial No. 88,571,097, #6 Exhibit 6 - Filing Receipt for Application Serial No. 88,600,649, #7 Exhibit 7 - Fleet Feet's Use of Mark in Franchise Sales, #8 Exhibit 8 - Fleet Feet's Use of Mark in Store Signage, #9 Exhibit 9 - Fleet Feet's Use of Mark on Apparel, #10 Exhibit 10 - Fleet Feet's Use of Mark in Email Newsletters, #11 Exhibit 11 - Fleet Feet's Use of Mark in Print, Online, and Social Media, #12 Exhibit 12 - Fleet Feet's Use of Mark on Promotional Materials, #13 Exhibit 13 - Nike Welcome Power Point, #14 Exhibit 14 - Vendor Partner Resource Guide, #15 Exhibit 15 - MLB All Star Game Commercial, #16 Exhibit 16 - Chicago Mural, #17 Exhibit 17 - July 22, 2019 Email from Scott Gravatt, #18 Exhibit 18 - August 7, 2019 Letter to Nike, #19 Exhibit 19 - Nike Website - August 12, 2019, #20 Exhibit 20 - Nike Website - August 29, 2019, #21 Exhibit 21 - Infringement in Mebane, NC, #22 Exhibit 22 - Infringement in Chicago, IL)(ANDERSON, CORBY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLEET FEET INCORPORATED v. NIKE INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike Retail Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIKE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fleet Feet Incorporated
Represented By: CORBY COCHRAN ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?