CUMBO v. BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS CUMBO
Defendant: BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00887
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/20/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LLC.. (THOMAS, ROBERT)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LLC. (THOMAS, ROBERT)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LLC. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 4, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30 (Powell, Gloria)
September 3, 2019 Case assigned to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle) Modified on 9/4/2019 to reflect proper judge assignment. (Powell, Gloria).
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2645090.), filed by DEMETRIUS CUMBO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FONG, WILSON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUMBO v. BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT E. THOMAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS CUMBO
Represented By: WILSON F. FONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?