PIPPEN et al v. BROWN SLAUGHTER et al
Plaintiff: MAXINE PATRICIA BROWN PIPPEN and MICHAEL J. PIPPEN
Defendant: ANTIONETTE NICOLE BROWN SLAUGHTER, KATRINA LAVERNE BROWN HARRISON, BRENNA M. RAGGHIANTI, EVELYN DELAINE BROWN JONES, CRUMLEY ROBERTS, LLC, JOHN CRAIG, III, THE TRUSTEES OF GUILFORD TECHNICAL COMMUNITY COLLEGE, ROBERT D. DOUGLAS, III, JAMES R. HARREL, D. TYLER NABORS and MARCIA LATANZA BROWN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00891
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. THE TRUSTEES OF GUILFORD TECHNICAL COMMUNITY COLLEGE shall answer or otherwise respond by 11/12/2019. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/22/2019. (AULD, L.)
October 22, 2019 Motion Referred: RE: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by THE TRUSTEES OF GUILFORD TECHNICAL COMMUNITY COLLEGE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DAWSON, ZACHARY)
September 4, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 4, 2019 Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 400.00. Receipt Number NCM047196. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MICHAEL J. PIPPEN, MAXINE PATRICIA BROWN PIPPEN.(Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PIPPEN et al v. BROWN SLAUGHTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXINE PATRICIA BROWN PIPPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. PIPPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTIONETTE NICOLE BROWN SLAUGHTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATRINA LAVERNE BROWN HARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENNA M. RAGGHIANTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVELYN DELAINE BROWN JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRUMLEY ROBERTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRAIG, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRUSTEES OF GUILFORD TECHNICAL COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: ZACHARY T. DAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT D. DOUGLAS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES R. HARREL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. TYLER NABORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCIA LATANZA BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?